TX HB2061 | 2013-2014 | 83rd Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 17-8)
Status: Engrossed on May 9 2013 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2013-05-17 - Committee report printed and distributed
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on May 9 2013 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2013-05-17 - Committee report printed and distributed
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Summary
Relating to a tax credit for investment in certain communities; imposing a monetary penalty; authorizing a fee.
Title
Relating to a tax credit for investment in certain communities; imposing a monetary penalty; authorizing a fee.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2013-05-09 - House - HB 2061Third Reading House (Y: 123 N: 4 NV: 3 Abs: 20) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-05-17 | Senate | Committee report printed and distributed |
2013-05-17 | Senate | Reported favorably w/o amendments |
2013-05-17 | Senate | Testimony taken in committee |
2013-05-17 | Senate | Considered in public hearing |
2013-05-17 | Senate | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . |
2013-05-16 | Senate | Posting rule suspended |
2013-05-17 | Senate | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . |
2013-05-15 | Senate | Referred to Economic Development |
2013-05-15 | Senate | Read first time |
2013-05-10 | Senate | Received from the House |
2013-05-09 | House | Reported engrossed |
2013-05-09 | House | Statement(s) of vote recorded in Journal |
2013-05-09 | House | Record vote |
2013-05-09 | House | Passed |
2013-05-09 | House | Read 3rd time |
2013-05-08 | House | Nonrecord vote recorded in Journal |
2013-05-08 | House | Passed to engrossment as amended |
2013-05-08 | House | Amended |
2013-05-08 | House | Amended |
2013-05-08 | House | Read 2nd time |
2013-05-07 | House | Placed on General State Calendar |
2013-05-03 | House | Considered in Calendars |
2013-04-24 | House | Committee report sent to Calendars |
2013-04-24 | House | Committee report distributed |
2013-04-23 | House | Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator |
2013-04-17 | House | Reported favorably as substituted |
2013-04-17 | House | Committee substitute considered in committee |
2013-04-17 | House | Considered in public hearing |
2013-04-03 | House | Left pending in committee |
2013-04-03 | House | Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee |
2013-04-03 | House | Committee substitute considered in committee |
2013-04-03 | House | Considered in public hearing |
2013-04-03 | House | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . |
2013-03-05 | House | Referred to Economic & Small Business Development |
2013-03-05 | House | Read first time |
2013-02-28 | House | Filed |
Subjects
Business & Commerce
Business & Commerce--General
COMPTROLLER OF PUBLIC ACCOUNTS
Economic & Industrial Development
Economic & Industrial Development--General
ECONOMIC DEVELOPMENT & TOURISM, OFFICE OF
ECONOMICALLY DISTRESSED AREAS
Taxation
Taxation--Property-Exemptions
Business & Commerce--General
COMPTROLLER OF PUBLIC ACCOUNTS
Economic & Industrial Development
Economic & Industrial Development--General
ECONOMIC DEVELOPMENT & TOURISM, OFFICE OF
ECONOMICALLY DISTRESSED AREAS
Taxation
Taxation--Property-Exemptions