TX HB2110 | 2017-2018 | 85th Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 20 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2017-05-02 - Comm. report sent to Local & Consent Calendar
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 20 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2017-05-02 - Comm. report sent to Local & Consent Calendar
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Summary
Relating to procedures for incorporation or establishment of another form of local government for certain areas subject to a regional participation agreement.
Title
Relating to procedures for incorporation or establishment of another form of local government for certain areas subject to a regional participation agreement.
Sponsors
Rep. Mark Keough [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-05-02 | House | Comm. report sent to Local & Consent Calendar |
2017-05-01 | House | Committee report distributed |
2017-05-01 | House | Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator |
2017-04-25 | House | Reported favorably as substituted |
2017-04-25 | House | Recommended to be sent to Local & Consent |
2017-04-25 | House | Committee substitute considered in committee |
2017-04-25 | House | Considered in public hearing |
2017-04-18 | House | Left pending in committee |
2017-04-18 | House | Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee |
2017-04-18 | House | Committee substitute considered in committee |
2017-04-18 | House | Considered in public hearing |
2017-04-18 | House | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . |
2017-03-22 | House | Referred to Urban Affairs |
2017-03-22 | House | Read first time |
2017-02-20 | House | Filed |
Subjects
City Government
City Government--General
Elections
Elections--General
Special Districts & Authorities
Special Districts & Authorities--Miscellaneous
City Government--General
Elections
Elections--General
Special Districts & Authorities
Special Districts & Authorities--Miscellaneous