TX HB2114 | 2015-2016 | 84th Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 9-0)
Status: Introduced on March 2 2015 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2015-05-14 - Postponed
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on March 2 2015 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2015-05-14 - Postponed
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Summary
Relating to the repeal of the inheritance tax.
Title
Relating to the repeal of the inheritance tax.
Sponsors
Rep. Jim Murphy [R] | Rep. Dwayne Bohac [R] | Rep. Patricia Harless [R] | Rep. Jason Villalba [R] |
Sen. Pat Fallon [R] | Rep. Dewayne Burns [R] | Rep. Wayne Faircloth [R] | Rep. Matt Krause [R] |
Rep. Dade Phelan [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-05-14 | House | Postponed |
2015-05-14 | House | Laid out as postponed business |
2015-05-12 | House | Postponed |
2015-05-12 | House | Laid out as postponed business |
2015-05-11 | House | Postponed |
2015-05-11 | House | Laid out as postponed business |
2015-05-07 | House | Postponed |
2015-05-07 | House | Laid out as postponed business |
2015-05-05 | House | Postponed |
2015-05-05 | House | Read 2nd time |
2015-05-05 | House | Placed on General State Calendar |
2015-04-30 | House | Considered in Calendars |
2015-04-23 | House | Committee report sent to Calendars |
2015-04-23 | House | Committee report distributed |
2015-04-22 | House | Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator |
2015-04-09 | House | Reported favorably as substituted |
2015-04-09 | House | Committee substitute considered in committee |
2015-04-09 | House | Considered in formal meeting |
2015-04-02 | House | Left pending in committee |
2015-04-02 | House | Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee |
2015-04-02 | House | Committee substitute considered in committee |
2015-04-02 | House | Considered in public hearing |
2015-03-31 | House | No action taken in committee |
2015-03-31 | House | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . |
2015-03-13 | House | Referred to Ways & Means |
2015-03-13 | House | Read first time |
2015-03-02 | House | Filed |