TX HB2215 | 2017-2018 | 85th Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on June 9 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-06-09 - Effective immediately
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on June 9 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-06-09 - Effective immediately
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
Relating to the deadline for adoption of desired future conditions in groundwater conservation districts.
Title
Relating to the deadline for adoption of desired future conditions in groundwater conservation districts.
Sponsors
Rep. Four Price [R] | Sen. Borris Miles [D] |
Roll Calls
2017-05-19 - Senate - Read 3rd time (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-05-19 - Senate - Three day rule suspended (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-04-27 - House - Nonrecord vote recorded in Journal RV#494 (Y: 144 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2017-05-19 - Senate - Three day rule suspended (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-04-27 - House - Nonrecord vote recorded in Journal RV#494 (Y: 144 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 3) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-06-09 | Effective immediately | |
2017-06-09 | Signed by the Governor | |
2017-05-25 | Sent to the Governor | |
2017-05-25 | Senate | Signed in the Senate |
2017-05-24 | House | Signed in the House |
2017-05-23 | House | Reported enrolled |
2017-05-20 | House | Senate passage reported |
2017-05-19 | Senate | Record vote |
2017-05-19 | Senate | Passed |
2017-05-19 | Senate | Read 3rd time |
2017-05-19 | Senate | Record vote |
2017-05-19 | Senate | Three day rule suspended |
2017-05-19 | Senate | Vote recorded in Journal |
2017-05-19 | Senate | Read 2nd time & passed to 3rd reading |
2017-05-19 | Senate | Laid before the Senate |
2017-05-19 | Senate | Placed on local & uncontested calendar |
2017-05-16 | Senate | Committee report printed and distributed |
2017-05-16 | Senate | Recommended for local & uncontested calendar |
2017-05-16 | Senate | Reported favorably w/o amendments |
2017-05-15 | Senate | Testimony taken in committee |
2017-05-15 | Senate | Considered in public hearing |
2017-05-15 | Senate | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . |
2017-05-04 | Senate | Referred to Agriculture, Water, & Rural Affairs |
2017-05-04 | Senate | Read first time |
2017-05-01 | Senate | Received from the House |
2017-04-27 | House | Reported engrossed |
2017-04-27 | House | Nonrecord vote recorded in Journal |
2017-04-27 | House | Statement(s) of vote recorded in Journal |
2017-04-27 | House | Record vote |
2017-04-27 | House | Passed |
2017-04-27 | House | Nonrecord vote recorded in Journal |
2017-04-27 | House | Read 3rd time |
2017-04-27 | House | Passed to engrossment |
2017-04-27 | House | Read 2nd time |
2017-04-27 | House | Placed on Local, Consent, and Res. Calendar |
2017-04-24 | House | Considered in Local & Consent Calendars |
2017-04-19 | House | Comm. report sent to Local & Consent Calendar |
2017-04-18 | House | Committee report distributed |
2017-04-18 | House | Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator |
2017-04-12 | House | Reported favorably as substituted |
2017-04-12 | House | Recommended to be sent to Local & Consent |
2017-04-12 | House | Committee substitute considered in committee |
2017-04-12 | House | Considered in public hearing |
2017-04-05 | House | Left pending in committee |
2017-04-05 | House | Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee |
2017-04-05 | House | Committee substitute considered in committee |
2017-04-05 | House | Considered in public hearing |
2017-04-05 | House | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . |
2017-03-20 | House | Referred to Natural Resources |
2017-03-20 | House | Read first time |
2017-02-21 | House | Filed |
Subjects
Special Districts & Authorities
Special Districts & Authorities--Groundwater Conserve Dist.
WATER
WATER DEVELOPMENT BOARD, TEXAS
Water--Development
Water--General
Special Districts & Authorities--Groundwater Conserve Dist.
WATER
WATER DEVELOPMENT BOARD, TEXAS
Water--Development
Water--General