TX HB2251 | 2019-2020 | 86th Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 6-1)
Status: Introduced on February 22 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-04-10 - Left pending in committee
Pending: House Judiciary & Civil Jurisprudence Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 22 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-04-10 - Left pending in committee
Pending: House Judiciary & Civil Jurisprudence Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Relating to certain deceptive advertising of legal services; imposing civil penalties.
Title
Relating to certain deceptive advertising of legal services; imposing civil penalties.
Sponsors
Rep. Giovanni Capriglione [R] | Rep. Toni Rose [D] | Rep. Jeff Leach [R] | Rep. J.D. Sheffield [R] |
Rep. John Zerwas [R] | Rep. Greg Bonnen [R] | Rep. Tom Oliverson [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-04-10 | House | Left pending in committee |
2019-04-10 | House | Committee substitute considered in committee |
2019-04-10 | House | Considered in formal meeting |
2019-03-25 | House | Left pending in committee |
2019-03-25 | House | Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee |
2019-03-25 | House | Committee substitute considered in committee |
2019-03-25 | House | Considered in public hearing |
2019-03-25 | House | Posting rule suspended |
2019-03-25 | House | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . |
2019-03-06 | House | Referred to Judiciary & Civil Jurisprudence |
2019-03-06 | House | Read first time |
2019-02-22 | House | Filed |
Same As/Similar To
SB1189 (Same As) 2019-06-07 - Effective on 9/1/19
Subjects
ADVERTISING
Business & Commerce
Business & Commerce--Trade Practices
Civil Remedies & Liabilities
Consumer Protection
Lawyers
Business & Commerce
Business & Commerce--Trade Practices
Civil Remedies & Liabilities
Consumer Protection
Lawyers
Texas State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://capitol.texas.gov/BillLookup/History.aspx?LegSess=86R&Bill=HB2251 |
Text | https://capitol.texas.gov/tlodocs/86R/billtext/html/HB02251I.htm |