TX HB2259 | 2009-2010 | 81st Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 9-2)
Status: Passed on June 19 2009 - 100% progression
Action: 2009-06-19 - Effective on 9/1/09
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 9-2)
Status: Passed on June 19 2009 - 100% progression
Action: 2009-06-19 - Effective on 9/1/09
Summary
Relating to the plugging of certain inactive oil or gas wells and to standards for electrical power lines serving certain oil and gas facilities.
Title
Relating to the plugging of certain inactive oil or gas wells and to standards for electrical power lines serving certain oil and gas facilities.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2009-06-19 | Effective on 9/1/09 | |
2009-06-19 | Signed by the Governor | |
2009-05-26 | Sent to the Governor | |
2009-05-25 | Signed in the Senate | |
2009-05-24 | Signed in the House | |
2009-05-23 | Reported enrolled | |
2009-05-21 | House concurs in Senate amendment(s)-reported | |
2009-05-20 | Text of Senate Amendment(s) | |
2009-05-20 | Record vote | |
2009-05-20 | House concurs in Senate amendment(s) | |
2009-05-19 | Senate Amendments Analysis distributed | |
2009-05-19 | Senate Amendments printed and distributed | |
2009-05-18 | Senate passage as amended reported | |
2009-05-18 | Record vote | |
2009-05-18 | Passed | |
2009-05-18 | Read 3rd time | |
2009-05-18 | Record vote | |
2009-05-18 | Three day rule suspended | |
2009-05-18 | Vote recorded in Journal | |
2009-05-18 | Passed to 3rd reading as amended | |
2009-05-18 | Vote recorded in Journal | |
2009-05-18 | Amended | |
2009-05-18 | Amendment(s) offered | |
2009-05-18 | Vote recorded in Journal | |
2009-05-18 | Amended | |
2009-05-18 | Amendment(s) offered | |
2009-05-18 | Read 2nd time | |
2009-05-18 | Rules suspended-Regular order of business | |
2009-05-15 | Placed on intent calendar | |
2009-05-13 | Committee report printed and distributed | |
2009-05-13 | Reported favorably as amended | |
2009-05-12 | Testimony taken in committee | |
2009-05-12 | Considered in public hearing | |
2009-05-12 | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . | |
2009-05-04 | Referred to Natural Resources | |
2009-05-04 | Read first time | |
2009-04-29 | Received from the House | |
2009-04-29 | Reported engrossed | |
2009-04-29 | Statement(s) of vote recorded in Journal | |
2009-04-29 | Record vote | |
2009-04-29 | Passed | |
2009-04-29 | Read 3rd time | |
2009-04-28 | Passed to engrossment | |
2009-04-28 | Statement(s) of vote recorded in Journal | |
2009-04-28 | Record vote | |
2009-04-28 | Amendment tabled | |
2009-04-28 | Point of order overruled (amendment) | |
2009-04-28 | Amendment(s) offered | |
2009-04-28 | Statement of Leg. Intent Recorded in Journal | |
2009-04-28 | Laid out as postponed business | |
2009-04-27 | Postponed | |
2009-04-27 | Laid out as postponed business | |
2009-04-27 | Postponed | |
2009-04-27 | Amendment withdrawn | |
2009-04-27 | Point of order withdrawn (amendment) | |
2009-04-27 | Amendment(s) offered | |
2009-04-27 | Laid out as postponed business | |
2009-04-27 | Postponed | |
2009-04-27 | Read 2nd time | |
2009-04-27 | Placed on General State Calendar | |
2009-04-24 | Considered in Calendars | |
2009-04-20 | Committee report sent to Calendars | |
2009-04-17 | Committee report printed and distributed | |
2009-04-17 | Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator | |
2009-04-08 | Reported favorably as substituted | |
2009-04-08 | Committee substitute considered in committee | |
2009-04-08 | Considered in public hearing | |
2009-03-25 | Left pending in committee | |
2009-03-25 | Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee | |
2009-03-25 | Considered in public hearing | |
2009-03-25 | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . | |
2009-03-09 | Referred to Energy Resources | |
2009-03-09 | Read first time | |
2009-03-03 | Filed |
Same As/Similar To
SB1378 (Same As) 2009-05-01 - Referred to Energy Resources