TX HB2274 | 2013-2014 | 83rd Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on March 4 2013 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2013-05-02 - Comm. report sent to Local & Consent Calendar
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on March 4 2013 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2013-05-02 - Comm. report sent to Local & Consent Calendar
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Relating to the use of municipal hotel occupancy tax revenue to enhance and upgrade sports facilities in certain municipalities.
Title
Relating to the use of municipal hotel occupancy tax revenue to enhance and upgrade sports facilities in certain municipalities.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-05-02 | House | Comm. report sent to Local & Consent Calendar |
2013-05-02 | House | Committee report distributed |
2013-05-01 | House | Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator |
2013-04-25 | House | Reported favorably w/o amendment(s) |
2013-04-25 | House | Recommended to be sent to Local & Consent |
2013-04-25 | House | Considered in formal meeting |
2013-04-25 | House | Scheduled for formal meeting on . . . |
2013-04-08 | House | Left pending in committee |
2013-04-08 | House | Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee |
2013-04-08 | House | Considered in public hearing |
2013-04-08 | House | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . |
2013-03-11 | House | Referred to Ways & Means |
2013-03-11 | House | Read first time |
2013-03-04 | House | Filed |
Subjects
City Government
City Government--General
HOTELS & MOTELS
RECREATIONAL & CULTURAL FACILITIES
Taxation
Taxation--Hotel, Motel Occupancy
UNIVERSITY OF HOUSTON SYSTEM
City Government--General
HOTELS & MOTELS
RECREATIONAL & CULTURAL FACILITIES
Taxation
Taxation--Hotel, Motel Occupancy
UNIVERSITY OF HOUSTON SYSTEM
Texas State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://www.legis.state.tx.us/BillLookup/History.aspx?LegSess=83R&Bill=HB2274 |
Text | http://www.legis.state.tx.us/tlodocs/83R/billtext/html/HB02274I.htm |