TX HB234 | 2013-2014 | 83rd Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on November 30 2012 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2013-04-15 - Considered in Calendars
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on November 30 2012 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2013-04-15 - Considered in Calendars
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Summary
Relating to the optional flexible school day program provided by school districts.
Title
Relating to the optional flexible school day program provided by school districts.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-04-15 | House | Considered in Calendars |
2013-03-22 | House | Committee report sent to Calendars |
2013-03-22 | House | Committee report distributed |
2013-03-21 | House | Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator |
2013-03-19 | House | Reported favorably w/o amendment(s) |
2013-03-19 | House | Vote reconsidered in committee |
2013-03-19 | House | Considered in public hearing |
2013-03-12 | House | Reported favorably w/o amendment(s) |
2013-03-12 | House | Considered in public hearing |
2013-02-26 | House | Left pending in committee |
2013-02-26 | House | Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee |
2013-02-26 | House | Considered in public hearing |
2013-02-26 | House | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . |
2013-02-07 | House | Referred to Public Education |
2013-02-07 | House | Read first time |
2012-11-30 | House | Filed |