TX HB234 | 2015-2016 | 84th Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 2-1)
Status: Engrossed on May 17 2015 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2015-05-19 - Referred to Criminal Justice
Pending: Senate Criminal Justice Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on May 17 2015 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2015-05-19 - Referred to Criminal Justice
Pending: Senate Criminal Justice Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Summary
Relating to certain costs associated with certain court proceedings for cruelly treated animals; authorizing fees and costs.
Title
Relating to certain costs associated with certain court proceedings for cruelly treated animals; authorizing fees and costs.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-05-19 | Senate | Referred to Criminal Justice |
2015-05-19 | Senate | Read first time |
2015-05-18 | Senate | Received from the House |
2015-05-17 | House | Reported engrossed |
2015-05-15 | House | Statement(s) of vote recorded in Journal |
2015-05-15 | House | Record vote |
2015-05-15 | House | Passed as amended |
2015-05-15 | House | Amended |
2015-05-15 | House | Amended |
2015-05-15 | House | Read 3rd time |
2015-05-14 | House | Passed to engrossment as amended |
2015-05-14 | House | Amended |
2015-05-14 | House | Read 2nd time |
2015-05-11 | House | Placed on General State Calendar |
2015-05-06 | House | Considered in Calendars |
2015-05-04 | House | Committee report sent to Calendars |
2015-05-01 | House | Transferred to Calendars Committee |
2015-05-01 | House | Considered in Local & Consent Calendars |
2015-04-30 | House | Returned to Local & Consent Calendars Comm. |
2015-04-30 | House | Withdrawn from calendar |
2015-04-30 | House | Placed on Local, Consent, and Res. Calendar |
2015-04-27 | House | Considered in Local & Consent Calendars |
2015-04-07 | House | Comm. report sent to Local & Consent Calendar |
2015-04-07 | House | Committee report distributed |
2015-04-06 | House | Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator |
2015-03-31 | House | Reported favorably as substituted |
2015-03-31 | House | Recommended to be sent to Local & Consent |
2015-03-31 | House | Vote reconsidered in committee |
2015-03-31 | House | Reported favorably as substituted |
2015-03-31 | House | Recommended to be sent to Local & Consent |
2015-03-31 | House | Committee substitute considered in committee |
2015-03-31 | House | Considered in formal meeting |
2015-03-10 | House | Left pending in committee |
2015-03-10 | House | Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee |
2015-03-10 | House | Committee substitute considered in committee |
2015-03-10 | House | Considered in public hearing |
2015-03-10 | House | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . |
2015-02-10 | House | Referred to Judiciary & Civil Jurisprudence |
2015-02-10 | House | Read first time |
2014-11-11 | House | Filed |