TX HB2429 | 2009-2010 | 81st Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on March 4 2009 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2009-03-23 - Left pending in subcommittee
Status: Introduced on March 4 2009 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2009-03-23 - Left pending in subcommittee
Summary
Relating to return-to-work coordination services and the return-to-work reimbursement program for employers participating in the Texas workers' compensation system.
Title
Relating to return-to-work coordination services and the return-to-work reimbursement program for employers participating in the Texas workers' compensation system.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2009-03-23 | Left pending in subcommittee | |
2009-03-23 | Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in subcommittee | |
2009-03-23 | Committee substitute considered in s/c | |
2009-03-23 | Considered by s/c in public hearing | |
2009-03-23 | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . | |
2009-03-16 | Subcommittee members named | |
2009-03-16 | Referred directly to subcommittee by chair | |
2009-03-11 | Referred to Business & Industry | |
2009-03-11 | Read first time | |
2009-03-04 | Filed |
Same As/Similar To
SB1814 (Similar To) 2009-06-19 - Effective immediately