TX HB2459 | 2011-2012 | 82nd Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 3-0)
Status: Introduced on March 8 2011 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2011-05-12 - Placed on General State Calendar
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on March 8 2011 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2011-05-12 - Placed on General State Calendar
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Summary
Relating to health care information submitted to the Department of State Health Services.
Title
Relating to health care information submitted to the Department of State Health Services.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-05-12 | Placed on General State Calendar | |
2011-05-10 | Considered in Calendars | |
2011-04-20 | Committee report sent to Calendars | |
2011-04-19 | Committee report distributed | |
2011-04-19 | Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator | |
2011-04-13 | Reported favorably as substituted | |
2011-04-13 | Committee substitute considered in committee | |
2011-04-13 | Considered in formal meeting | |
2011-03-24 | Left pending in committee | |
2011-03-24 | Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee | |
2011-03-24 | Considered in public hearing | |
2011-03-23 | No action taken in committee | |
2011-03-23 | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . | |
2011-03-14 | Referred to Public Health | |
2011-03-14 | Read first time | |
2011-03-08 | Filed |
Subjects
Health
HEALTH & HUMAN SERVICES COMMISSION
Health Care Providers
Health--General
INTERNET
State Agencies, Boards & Commissions
STATE HEALTH SERVICES, DEPARTMENT OF
HEALTH & HUMAN SERVICES COMMISSION
Health Care Providers
Health--General
INTERNET
State Agencies, Boards & Commissions
STATE HEALTH SERVICES, DEPARTMENT OF