TX HB2497 | 2023-2024 | 88th Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on June 12 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-06-12 - Effective immediately
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on June 12 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-06-12 - Effective immediately
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
Relating to the use of municipal hotel occupancy tax revenue by certain municipalities.
Title
Relating to the use of municipal hotel occupancy tax revenue by certain municipalities.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2023-05-17 - Senate - Read 3rd time (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-05-17 - Senate - Three day rule suspended (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-04-28 - House - Read 3rd time RV#681 (Y: 144 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2023-05-17 - Senate - Three day rule suspended (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-04-28 - House - Read 3rd time RV#681 (Y: 144 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 4) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-06-12 | Effective immediately | |
2023-06-12 | Signed by the Governor | |
2023-05-22 | Sent to the Governor | |
2023-05-21 | Senate | Signed in the Senate |
2023-05-19 | House | Signed in the House |
2023-05-18 | House | Reported enrolled |
2023-05-17 | House | Senate passage reported |
2023-05-17 | Senate | Record vote |
2023-05-17 | Senate | Passed |
2023-05-17 | Senate | Read 3rd time |
2023-05-17 | Senate | Record vote |
2023-05-17 | Senate | Three day rule suspended |
2023-05-17 | Senate | Vote recorded in Journal |
2023-05-17 | Senate | Read 2nd time & passed to 3rd reading |
2023-05-17 | Senate | Laid before the Senate |
2023-05-17 | Senate | Placed on local & uncontested calendar |
2023-05-12 | Senate | Committee report printed and distributed |
2023-05-12 | Senate | Recommended for local & uncontested calendar |
2023-05-12 | Senate | Reported favorably w/o amendments |
2023-05-12 | Senate | Vote taken in committee |
2023-05-12 | Senate | Considered in public hearing |
2023-05-10 | Senate | Left pending in committee |
2023-05-10 | Senate | Considered in public hearing |
2023-05-10 | Senate | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . |
2023-05-01 | Senate | Referred to Natural Resources & Economic Development |
2023-05-01 | Senate | Read first time |
2023-05-01 | Senate | Received from the House |
2023-04-28 | House | Reported engrossed |
2023-04-28 | House | Nonrecord vote recorded in Journal |
2023-04-28 | House | Statement(s) of vote recorded in Journal |
2023-04-28 | House | Record vote RV#681 |
2023-04-28 | House | Passed |
2023-04-28 | House | Read 3rd time |
2023-04-28 | House | Nonrecord vote recorded in Journal |
2023-04-28 | House | Passed to engrossment |
2023-04-28 | House | Read 2nd time |
2023-04-28 | House | Placed on Local, Consent, and Res. Calendar |
2023-04-25 | House | Considered in Local & Consent Calendars |
2023-04-20 | House | Comm. report sent to Local & Consent Calendar |
2023-04-19 | House | Committee report distributed |
2023-04-19 | House | Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator |
2023-04-11 | House | Reported favorably as substituted |
2023-04-11 | House | Recommended to be sent to Local & Consent |
2023-04-11 | House | Committee substitute considered in committee |
2023-04-11 | House | Considered in formal meeting |
2023-04-03 | House | Left pending in committee |
2023-04-03 | House | Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee |
2023-04-03 | House | Committee substitute considered in committee |
2023-04-03 | House | Considered in public hearing |
2023-04-03 | House | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . |
2023-03-13 | House | Referred to Ways & Means |
2023-03-13 | House | Read first time |
2023-02-17 | House | Filed |
Same As/Similar To
SB644 (Same As) 2023-02-17 - Referred to Natural Resources & Economic Development
SB644 (Same As) 2023-02-17 - Referred to Natural Resources & Economic Development
SB644 (Same As) 2023-02-17 - Referred to Natural Resources & Economic Development
Subjects
Amusements, Games, Sports
BAY CITY, CITY OF
City Government
City Government--Finance
COLORADO RIVER
GULF OF MEXICO
MATAGORDA COUNTY
RECREATIONAL & CULTURAL FACILITIES
Taxation
Taxation--Hotel, Motel Occupancy
BAY CITY, CITY OF
City Government
City Government--Finance
COLORADO RIVER
GULF OF MEXICO
MATAGORDA COUNTY
RECREATIONAL & CULTURAL FACILITIES
Taxation
Taxation--Hotel, Motel Occupancy