TX HB2527 | 2009-2010 | 81st Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on May 23 2009 - 100% progression
Action: 2009-05-23 - Effective on 9/1/09
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on May 23 2009 - 100% progression
Action: 2009-05-23 - Effective on 9/1/09
Summary
Relating to the regulation of commercial fertilizer.
Title
Relating to the regulation of commercial fertilizer.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2009-05-23 | Effective on 9/1/09 | |
2009-05-23 | Signed by the Governor | |
2009-05-14 | Sent to the Governor | |
2009-05-14 | Signed in the Senate | |
2009-05-14 | Signed in the House | |
2009-05-14 | Reported enrolled | |
2009-05-12 | Senate passage reported | |
2009-05-12 | Record vote | |
2009-05-12 | Passed | |
2009-05-12 | Read 3rd time | |
2009-05-12 | Record vote | |
2009-05-12 | Three day rule suspended | |
2009-05-12 | Vote recorded in Journal | |
2009-05-12 | Read 2nd time & passed to 3rd reading | |
2009-05-12 | Laid before the Senate | |
2009-05-12 | Placed on local & uncontested calendar | |
2009-05-04 | Committee report printed and distributed | |
2009-05-04 | Recommended for local & uncontested calendar | |
2009-05-04 | Reported favorably w/o amendments | |
2009-04-28 | Considered in public hearing | |
2009-04-28 | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . | |
2009-04-24 | Referred to Agriculture & Rural Affairs | |
2009-04-24 | Read first time | |
2009-04-24 | Received from the House | |
2009-04-23 | Reported engrossed | |
2009-04-23 | Record vote | |
2009-04-23 | Passed | |
2009-04-23 | Read 3rd time | |
2009-04-22 | Passed to engrossment | |
2009-04-22 | Read 2nd time | |
2009-04-22 | Placed on General State Calendar | |
2009-04-20 | Considered in Calendars | |
2009-04-08 | Committee report sent to Calendars | |
2009-04-07 | Committee report printed and distributed | |
2009-04-07 | Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator | |
2009-04-02 | Reported favorably w/o amendment(s) | |
2009-04-02 | Considered in formal meeting | |
2009-03-31 | Left pending in committee | |
2009-03-31 | Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee | |
2009-03-31 | Considered in public hearing | |
2009-03-31 | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . | |
2009-03-11 | Referred to Agriculture & Livestock | |
2009-03-11 | Read first time | |
2009-03-05 | Filed |
Same As/Similar To
SB1309 (Same As) 2009-04-20 - Committee report printed and distributed