TX HB2552 | 2017-2018 | 85th Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-1)
Status: Passed on June 15 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-06-15 - Effective on 9/1/17
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-1)
Status: Passed on June 15 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-06-15 - Effective on 9/1/17
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
Relating to measures to address and deter certain criminal or other unlawful activity, including trafficking of persons, sexual offenses, prostitution, and activity that may constitute a public nuisance; increasing criminal penalties; creating a criminal offense.
Title
Relating to measures to address and deter certain criminal or other unlawful activity, including trafficking of persons, sexual offenses, prostitution, and activity that may constitute a public nuisance; increasing criminal penalties; creating a criminal offense.
Sponsors
Rep. Senfronia Thompson [D] | Rep. Dawnna Dukes [D] | Sen. Joan Huffman [R] | Sen. Sylvia Garcia [D] |
Sen. Jose Menendez [D] |
Roll Calls
2017-05-27 - House - House concurs in Senate amendment(s) RV#1946 (Y: 136 N: 8 NV: 2 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2017-05-22 - Senate - Read 3rd time (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-05-22 - Senate - Three day rule suspended (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-05-12 - House - Read 3rd time RV#1227 (Y: 133 N: 9 NV: 1 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2017-05-11 - House - Amended RV#1191 (Y: 137 N: 9 NV: 2 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2017-05-11 - House - RV#1190 (Y: 127 N: 1 NV: 2 Abs: 20) [PASS]
2017-05-22 - Senate - Read 3rd time (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-05-22 - Senate - Three day rule suspended (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-05-12 - House - Read 3rd time RV#1227 (Y: 133 N: 9 NV: 1 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2017-05-11 - House - Amended RV#1191 (Y: 137 N: 9 NV: 2 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2017-05-11 - House - RV#1190 (Y: 127 N: 1 NV: 2 Abs: 20) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-06-15 | Effective on 9/1/17 | |
2017-06-15 | Signed by the Governor | |
2017-05-30 | Sent to the Governor | |
2017-05-30 | Senate | Signed in the Senate |
2017-05-29 | House | Signed in the House |
2017-05-29 | House | Reported enrolled |
2017-05-27 | Senate | House concurs in Senate amendment(s)-reported |
2017-05-27 | Senate | House discharges conferees-reported |
2017-05-27 | House | Text of Senate Amendment(s) |
2017-05-27 | House | Statement(s) of vote recorded in Journal |
2017-05-27 | House | Record vote |
2017-05-27 | House | House concurs in Senate amendment(s) |
2017-05-27 | House | House discharges conferees |
2017-05-26 | House | Senate appoints conferees-reported |
2017-05-26 | House | Senate grants request for conf comm-reported |
2017-05-26 | Senate | Senate appoints conferees |
2017-05-26 | Senate | Senate grants request for conference comm. |
2017-05-24 | Senate | House appoints conferees-reported |
2017-05-24 | Senate | House requests conference committee-reported |
2017-05-24 | Senate | House refuses to concur-reported |
2017-05-24 | House | House appoints conferees |
2017-05-24 | House | House requests conference committee |
2017-05-24 | House | House refuses to concur in Senate amendments |
2017-05-23 | House | Senate Amendments Analysis distributed |
2017-05-23 | House | Senate Amendments distributed |
2017-05-22 | House | Senate passage as amended reported |
2017-05-22 | Senate | Record vote |
2017-05-22 | Senate | Passed |
2017-05-22 | Senate | Read 3rd time |
2017-05-22 | Senate | Record vote |
2017-05-22 | Senate | Three day rule suspended |
2017-05-22 | Senate | Vote recorded in Journal |
2017-05-22 | Senate | Passed to 3rd reading as amended |
2017-05-22 | Senate | Vote recorded in Journal |
2017-05-22 | Senate | Amended |
2017-05-22 | Senate | Amendment(s) offered |
2017-05-22 | Senate | Vote recorded in Journal |
2017-05-22 | Senate | Amended |
2017-05-22 | Senate | Amendment(s) offered |
2017-05-22 | Senate | Read 2nd time |
2017-05-22 | Senate | Rules suspended-Regular order of business |
2017-05-21 | Senate | Co-sponsor authorized |
2017-05-19 | Senate | Co-sponsor authorized |
2017-05-21 | Senate | Placed on intent calendar |
2017-05-18 | Senate | Committee report printed and distributed |
2017-05-18 | Senate | Recommended for local & uncontested calendar |
2017-05-18 | Senate | Reported favorably w/o amendments |
2017-05-18 | Senate | Considered in public hearing |
2017-05-18 | Senate | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . |
2017-05-15 | Senate | Referred to State Affairs |
2017-05-15 | Senate | Read first time |
2017-05-15 | Senate | Received from the House |
2017-05-12 | House | Reported engrossed |
2017-05-12 | House | Record vote |
2017-05-12 | House | Passed |
2017-05-12 | House | Read 3rd time |
2017-05-11 | House | Statement(s) of vote recorded in Journal |
2017-05-11 | House | Record vote |
2017-05-11 | House | Passed to engrossment as amended |
2017-05-11 | House | Amended |
2017-05-11 | House | Amendment adopted as amended |
2017-05-11 | House | Amendment amended |
2017-05-11 | House | Point of order overruled |
2017-05-11 | House | Amendment to amendment offered |
2017-05-11 | House | Amendment(s) offered |
2017-05-11 | House | Laid out as postponed business |
2017-05-11 | House | Postponed |
2017-05-11 | House | Amendment withdrawn |
2017-05-11 | House | Amended |
2017-05-11 | House | Amended |
2017-05-11 | House | Amended |
2017-05-11 | House | Statement(s) of vote recorded in Journal |
2017-05-11 | House | Record vote |
2017-05-11 | House | Amended |
2017-05-11 | House | Read 2nd time |
2017-05-08 | House | Placed on General State Calendar |
2017-05-04 | House | Considered in Calendars |
2017-05-02 | House | Committee report sent to Calendars |
2017-05-02 | House | Committee report distributed |
2017-05-02 | House | Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator |
2017-04-27 | House | Reported favorably as substituted |
2017-04-27 | House | Committee substitute considered in committee |
2017-04-27 | House | Considered in formal meeting |
2017-04-18 | House | Left pending in committee |
2017-04-18 | House | Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee |
2017-04-18 | House | Committee substitute considered in committee |
2017-04-18 | House | Considered in public hearing |
2017-04-18 | House | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . |
2017-03-31 | House | Referred to Judiciary & Civil Jurisprudence |
2017-03-31 | House | Read first time |
2017-02-28 | House | Filed |
Subjects
Crimes
Crimes--Against Persons
Crimes--Against Persons--General
Crimes--Against Persons--Sexual
HEALTH & HUMAN SERVICES COMMISSION
HUMAN TRAFFICKING
LICENSING & REGULATION, TEXAS COMMISSION OF
Property Interests
Property Interests--Landlord & Tenant
PROSTITUTION
SIGNS
Crimes--Against Persons
Crimes--Against Persons--General
Crimes--Against Persons--Sexual
HEALTH & HUMAN SERVICES COMMISSION
HUMAN TRAFFICKING
LICENSING & REGULATION, TEXAS COMMISSION OF
Property Interests
Property Interests--Landlord & Tenant
PROSTITUTION
SIGNS