TX HB2552 | 2021-2022 | 87th Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on March 2 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-05-03 - Committee report sent to Calendars
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on March 2 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-05-03 - Committee report sent to Calendars
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Summary
Relating to certain Department of Family and Protective Services procedures during an investigation of child abuse or neglect.
Title
Relating to certain Department of Family and Protective Services procedures during an investigation of child abuse or neglect.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-05-03 | House | Committee report sent to Calendars |
2021-05-01 | House | Committee report distributed |
2021-04-30 | House | Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator |
2021-04-27 | House | Reported favorably as substituted |
2021-04-27 | House | Committee substitute considered in committee |
2021-04-27 | House | Considered in public hearing |
2021-03-23 | House | Left pending in committee |
2021-03-23 | House | Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee |
2021-03-23 | House | Committee substitute considered in committee |
2021-03-23 | House | Considered in public hearing |
2021-03-23 | House | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . |
2021-03-17 | House | Referred to Human Services |
2021-03-17 | House | Read first time |
2021-03-02 | House | Filed |
Subjects
CHILD ABUSE
EVIDENCE
Family
FAMILY & PROTECTIVE SERVICES, DEPARTMENT OF
Family--Child Protection
Family--Parent & Child
EVIDENCE
Family
FAMILY & PROTECTIVE SERVICES, DEPARTMENT OF
Family--Child Protection
Family--Parent & Child