TX HB2580 | 2009-2010 | 81st Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on June 19 2009 - 100% progression
Action: 2009-06-19 - Effective immediately
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on June 19 2009 - 100% progression
Action: 2009-06-19 - Effective immediately
Summary
Relating to the establishment of a peace officer employment opportunity Internet website by the Texas Workforce Commission.
Title
Relating to the establishment of a peace officer employment opportunity Internet website by the Texas Workforce Commission.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2009-06-19 | Effective immediately | |
2009-06-19 | Signed by the Governor | |
2009-05-26 | Sent to the Governor | |
2009-05-25 | Signed in the Senate | |
2009-05-25 | Signed in the House | |
2009-05-25 | Reported enrolled | |
2009-05-25 | House concurs in Senate amendment(s)-reported | |
2009-05-23 | Text of Senate Amendment(s) | |
2009-05-23 | Record vote | |
2009-05-23 | House concurs in Senate amendment(s) | |
2009-05-21 | Senate Amendments Analysis distributed | |
2009-05-21 | Senate Amendments printed and distributed | |
2009-05-21 | Senate passage as amended reported | |
2009-05-21 | Record vote | |
2009-05-21 | Passed | |
2009-05-21 | Read 3rd time | |
2009-05-21 | Record vote | |
2009-05-21 | Three day rule suspended | |
2009-05-21 | Vote recorded in Journal | |
2009-05-21 | Read 2nd time & passed to 3rd reading | |
2009-05-21 | Laid before the Senate | |
2009-05-21 | Placed on local & uncontested calendar | |
2009-05-14 | Committee report printed and distributed | |
2009-05-14 | Recommended for local & uncontested calendar | |
2009-05-14 | Reported favorably as substituted | |
2009-05-13 | Considered in public hearing | |
2009-05-13 | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . | |
2009-05-12 | Left pending in committee | |
2009-05-12 | Testimony taken in committee | |
2009-05-12 | Considered in public hearing | |
2009-05-12 | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . | |
2009-05-01 | Referred to Criminal Justice | |
2009-05-01 | Read first time | |
2009-04-29 | Received from the House | |
2009-04-28 | Reported engrossed | |
2009-04-28 | Statement(s) of vote recorded in Journal | |
2009-04-28 | Record vote | |
2009-04-28 | Passed | |
2009-04-28 | Read 3rd time | |
2009-04-27 | Nonrecord vote recorded in Journal | |
2009-04-27 | Passed to engrossment | |
2009-04-27 | Read 2nd time | |
2009-04-27 | Placed on General State Calendar | |
2009-04-24 | Considered in Calendars | |
2009-04-15 | Committee report sent to Calendars | |
2009-04-14 | Committee report printed and distributed | |
2009-04-14 | Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator | |
2009-04-08 | Reported favorably w/o amendment(s) | |
2009-04-08 | Considered in formal meeting | |
2009-04-01 | Left pending in committee | |
2009-04-01 | Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee | |
2009-04-01 | Considered in public hearing | |
2009-04-01 | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . | |
2009-03-11 | Referred to Public Safety | |
2009-03-11 | Read first time | |
2009-03-05 | Filed |
Same As/Similar To
SB489 (Same As) 2009-02-17 - Referred to Criminal Justice
Subjects
Electronic Information Systems
Fire Fighters & Police
Fire Fighters & Police--General
INTERNET
Law Enforcement
LAW ENFORCEMENT OFFICER STANDARDS & EDUCATION, COMMN. ON
PEACE OFFICERS
Fire Fighters & Police
Fire Fighters & Police--General
INTERNET
Law Enforcement
LAW ENFORCEMENT OFFICER STANDARDS & EDUCATION, COMMN. ON
PEACE OFFICERS