TX HB2580 | 2013-2014 | 83rd Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on May 3 2013 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2013-05-07 - Referred to Transportation
Pending: Senate Transportation Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on May 3 2013 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2013-05-07 - Referred to Transportation
Pending: Senate Transportation Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Relating to the authority of municipalities to create freight rail districts that have the powers of rural rail transportation districts; granting the power of eminent domain.
Title
Relating to the authority of municipalities to create freight rail districts that have the powers of rural rail transportation districts; granting the power of eminent domain.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-05-07 | Senate | Referred to Transportation |
2013-05-07 | Senate | Read first time |
2013-05-06 | Senate | Received from the House |
2013-05-03 | House | Reported engrossed |
2013-05-02 | House | Nonrecord vote recorded in Journal |
2013-05-02 | House | Record vote |
2013-05-02 | House | Passed |
2013-05-02 | House | Read 3rd time |
2013-05-02 | House | Nonrecord vote recorded in Journal |
2013-05-02 | House | Passed to engrossment |
2013-05-02 | House | Read 2nd time |
2013-05-02 | House | Placed on Local, Consent, and Res. Calendar |
2013-04-29 | House | Considered in Local & Consent Calendars |
2013-04-25 | House | Comm. report sent to Local & Consent Calendar |
2013-04-25 | House | Committee report distributed |
2013-04-24 | House | Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator |
2013-04-23 | House | Reported favorably w/o amendment(s) |
2013-04-23 | House | Recommended to be sent to Local & Consent |
2013-04-23 | House | Considered in formal meeting |
2013-04-09 | House | Left pending in committee |
2013-04-09 | House | Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee |
2013-04-09 | House | Considered in public hearing |
2013-04-09 | House | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . |
2013-03-20 | House | Referred to Transportation |
2013-03-20 | House | Read first time |
2013-03-06 | House | Filed |
Subjects
City Government
City Government--General
Property Interests
Property Interests--Eminent Domain
Special Districts & Authorities
Special Districts & Authorities--Miscellaneous
Transportation
Transportation--Railroads
Transportation--Rural
City Government--General
Property Interests
Property Interests--Eminent Domain
Special Districts & Authorities
Special Districts & Authorities--Miscellaneous
Transportation
Transportation--Railroads
Transportation--Rural
Texas State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://www.legis.state.tx.us/BillLookup/History.aspx?LegSess=83R&Bill=HB2580 |
Text | http://www.legis.state.tx.us/tlodocs/83R/billtext/html/HB02580I.htm |