TX HB2639 | 2011-2012 | 82nd Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on March 9 2011 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2011-05-10 - Committee report sent to Calendars
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on March 9 2011 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2011-05-10 - Committee report sent to Calendars
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Summary
Relating to motor vehicle inspections that employ remote sensing equipment.
Title
Relating to motor vehicle inspections that employ remote sensing equipment.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-05-10 | Committee report sent to Calendars | |
2011-05-10 | Committee report distributed | |
2011-05-10 | Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator | |
2011-05-09 | Reported favorably as substituted | |
2011-05-09 | Committee substitute considered in committee | |
2011-05-09 | Considered in formal meeting | |
2011-04-13 | Left pending in committee | |
2011-04-13 | Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee | |
2011-04-13 | Considered in public hearing | |
2011-04-13 | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . | |
2011-03-16 | Referred to Environmental Regulation | |
2011-03-16 | Read first time | |
2011-03-09 | Filed |
Subjects
Environment
Environment--Air
ENVIRONMENTAL QUALITY, TEXAS COMMISSION ON
MOTOR VEHICLES, TEXAS DEPARTMENT OF
PUBLIC SAFETY COMMISSION
VEHICLE EMISSIONS
Vehicles & Traffic
Vehicles & Traffic--General
Vehicles & Traffic--Vehicle Registration
Environment--Air
ENVIRONMENTAL QUALITY, TEXAS COMMISSION ON
MOTOR VEHICLES, TEXAS DEPARTMENT OF
PUBLIC SAFETY COMMISSION
VEHICLE EMISSIONS
Vehicles & Traffic
Vehicles & Traffic--General
Vehicles & Traffic--Vehicle Registration