TX HB2668 | 2017-2018 | 85th Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 3-0)
Status: Introduced on March 1 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2017-05-09 - Committee report sent to Calendars
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on March 1 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2017-05-09 - Committee report sent to Calendars
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Summary
Relating to a mechanic's or materialman's lien for retained funds under certain construction contracts.
Title
Relating to a mechanic's or materialman's lien for retained funds under certain construction contracts.
Sponsors
Rep. John Wray [R] | Rep. Jason Villalba [R] | Rep. Jeff Leach [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-05-09 | House | Committee report sent to Calendars |
2017-05-08 | House | Committee report distributed |
2017-05-08 | House | Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator |
2017-05-03 | House | Reported favorably w/o amendment(s) |
2017-05-03 | House | Considered in formal meeting |
2017-04-24 | House | Left pending in committee |
2017-04-24 | House | Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee |
2017-04-24 | House | Considered in public hearing |
2017-04-24 | House | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . |
2017-03-23 | House | Referred to Business & Industry |
2017-03-23 | House | Read first time |
2017-03-01 | House | Filed |
Subjects
INSURANCE, TEXAS DEPARTMENT OF
MATERIALMEN'S LIENS
MECHANICS' LIENS
Property Interests
Property Interests--Mortgages & Liens
Property Interests--Real Property
MATERIALMEN'S LIENS
MECHANICS' LIENS
Property Interests
Property Interests--Mortgages & Liens
Property Interests--Real Property