TX HB2691 | 2017-2018 | 85th Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 4-1)
Status: Engrossed on May 12 2017 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2017-05-27 - Senate appoints conferees-reported
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on May 12 2017 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2017-05-27 - Senate appoints conferees-reported
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Summary
Relating to certain election practices and procedures.
Title
Relating to certain election practices and procedures.
Sponsors
Rep. Greg Bonnen [R] | Rep. Tom Oliverson [R] | Rep. Ron Reynolds [D] | Rep. Wayne Faircloth [R] |
Sen. Joan Huffman [R] |
Roll Calls
2017-05-22 - Senate - Read 3rd time (Y: 20 N: 11 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-05-22 - Senate - Rules suspended-Regular order of business (Y: 20 N: 11 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-05-21 - Senate - Amendment withdrawn (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-05-21 - Senate - FA5 Huffman (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-05-21 - Senate - FA1 Huffman (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-05-12 - House - Read 3rd time RV#1240 (Y: 142 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2017-05-11 - House - Amended RV#1197 (Y: 130 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 18) [PASS]
2017-05-22 - Senate - Rules suspended-Regular order of business (Y: 20 N: 11 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-05-21 - Senate - Amendment withdrawn (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-05-21 - Senate - FA5 Huffman (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-05-21 - Senate - FA1 Huffman (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-05-12 - House - Read 3rd time RV#1240 (Y: 142 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2017-05-11 - House - Amended RV#1197 (Y: 130 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 18) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-05-27 | House | Senate appoints conferees-reported |
2017-05-27 | House | Senate grants request for conf comm-reported |
2017-05-26 | Senate | Senate appoints conferees |
2017-05-26 | Senate | Senate grants request for conference comm. |
2017-05-25 | Senate | House appoints conferees-reported |
2017-05-25 | Senate | House requests conference committee-reported |
2017-05-25 | Senate | House refuses to concur-reported |
2017-05-25 | House | House appoints conferees |
2017-05-25 | House | House requests conference committee |
2017-05-25 | House | House refuses to concur in Senate amendments |
2017-05-22 | House | Senate Amendments Analysis distributed |
2017-05-22 | House | Senate Amendments distributed |
2017-05-22 | House | Senate passage as amended reported |
2017-05-22 | Senate | Record vote |
2017-05-22 | Senate | Passed |
2017-05-22 | Senate | Read 3rd time |
2017-05-22 | Senate | Record vote |
2017-05-22 | Senate | Rules suspended-Regular order of business |
2017-05-21 | Senate | Record vote |
2017-05-21 | Senate | Passed to 3rd reading as amended |
2017-05-21 | Senate | Amendment withdrawn |
2017-05-21 | Senate | Record vote |
2017-05-21 | Senate | Amended |
2017-05-21 | Senate | Amendment(s) offered |
2017-05-21 | Senate | Vote recorded in Journal |
2017-05-21 | Senate | Amended |
2017-05-21 | Senate | Amendment(s) offered |
2017-05-21 | Senate | Vote recorded in Journal |
2017-05-21 | Senate | Amended |
2017-05-21 | Senate | Amendment(s) offered |
2017-05-21 | Senate | Amendment withdrawn |
2017-05-21 | Senate | Amendment(s) offered |
2017-05-21 | Senate | Record vote |
2017-05-21 | Senate | Amended |
2017-05-21 | Senate | Amendment(s) offered |
2017-05-21 | Senate | Read 2nd time |
2017-05-21 | Senate | Vote recorded in Journal |
2017-05-21 | Senate | Rules suspended-Regular order of business |
2017-05-21 | Senate | Placed on intent calendar |
2017-05-19 | Senate | Committee report printed and distributed |
2017-05-19 | Senate | Reported favorably as substituted |
2017-05-18 | Senate | Considered in public hearing |
2017-05-18 | Senate | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . |
2017-05-15 | Senate | Referred to State Affairs |
2017-05-15 | Senate | Read first time |
2017-05-15 | Senate | Received from the House |
2017-05-12 | House | Reported engrossed |
2017-05-12 | House | Record vote |
2017-05-12 | House | Passed |
2017-05-12 | House | Read 3rd time |
2017-05-11 | House | Statement(s) of vote recorded in Journal |
2017-05-11 | House | Record vote |
2017-05-11 | House | Passed to engrossment as amended |
2017-05-11 | House | Amended |
2017-05-11 | House | Laid out as postponed business |
2017-05-11 | House | Postponed |
2017-05-11 | House | Amended |
2017-05-11 | House | Amended |
2017-05-11 | House | Amended |
2017-05-11 | House | Amended |
2017-05-11 | House | Read 2nd time |
2017-05-08 | House | Placed on General State Calendar |
2017-05-04 | House | Considered in Calendars |
2017-05-03 | House | Committee report sent to Calendars |
2017-05-03 | House | Committee report distributed |
2017-05-02 | House | Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator |
2017-04-27 | House | Reported favorably as substituted |
2017-04-27 | House | Committee substitute considered in committee |
2017-04-27 | House | Considered in formal meeting |
2017-04-17 | House | Left pending in committee |
2017-04-17 | House | Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee |
2017-04-17 | House | Considered in public hearing |
2017-04-17 | House | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . |
2017-03-23 | House | Referred to Elections |
2017-03-23 | House | Read first time |
2017-03-02 | House | Filed |
Subjects
County Government
County Government--Employees/Officers
Courts
Courts--Judges
Elections
Elections--Administration
Elections--Election Officers
Elections--General
SECRETARY OF STATE
County Government--Employees/Officers
Courts
Courts--Judges
Elections
Elections--Administration
Elections--Election Officers
Elections--General
SECRETARY OF STATE