TX HB270 | 2011-2012 | 82nd Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on March 9 2011 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2011-05-09 - Laid on the table subject to call
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on March 9 2011 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2011-05-09 - Laid on the table subject to call
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Summary
Relating to sales and use tax information provided to certain local governmental entities.
Title
Relating to sales and use tax information provided to certain local governmental entities.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-05-09 | Laid on the table subject to call | |
2011-05-09 | Companion considered in lieu of | |
2011-05-05 | Placed on General State Calendar | |
2011-05-03 | Considered in Calendars | |
2011-05-02 | Considered in Calendars | |
2011-04-07 | Corrected committee report sent to Calendars | |
2011-04-06 | Corrected comm. report distributed | |
2011-04-06 | Corrected com rept filed w/ Comte Coordinator | |
2011-04-06 | Committee report sent to Calendars | |
2011-04-05 | Committee report distributed | |
2011-04-05 | Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator | |
2011-03-28 | Reported favorably as substituted | |
2011-03-28 | Committee substitute considered in committee | |
2011-03-28 | Considered in public hearing | |
2011-03-21 | Left pending in committee | |
2011-03-21 | Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee | |
2011-03-21 | Committee substitute considered in committee | |
2011-03-21 | Considered in public hearing | |
2011-03-21 | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . | |
2011-03-10 | Referred to Ways & Means | |
2011-03-10 | Read first time | |
2011-03-09 | Filed |