TX HB2726 | 2013-2014 | 83rd Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on March 6 2013 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2013-04-02 - Left pending in committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on March 6 2013 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2013-04-02 - Left pending in committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Relating to disputing the certification of maximum medical improvement and evaluation of impairment rating.
Title
Relating to disputing the certification of maximum medical improvement and evaluation of impairment rating.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-04-02 | House | Left pending in committee |
2013-04-02 | House | Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee |
2013-04-02 | House | Committee substitute considered in committee |
2013-04-02 | House | Considered in public hearing |
2013-04-02 | House | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . |
2013-03-26 | House | Meeting cancelled |
2013-03-26 | House | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . |
2013-03-18 | House | Referred to Business & Industry |
2013-03-18 | House | Read first time |
2013-03-06 | House | Filed |
Subjects
Texas State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://www.legis.state.tx.us/BillLookup/History.aspx?LegSess=83R&Bill=HB2726 |
Text | http://www.legis.state.tx.us/tlodocs/83R/billtext/html/HB02726I.htm |