TX HB2768 | 2021-2022 | 87th Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on March 3 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-04-30 - Laid on the table subject to call
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on March 3 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-04-30 - Laid on the table subject to call
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Relating to the composition of the board of directors of the Booker Hospital District.
Title
Relating to the composition of the board of directors of the Booker Hospital District.
Sponsors
Rep. Ken King [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-04-30 | House | Laid on the table subject to call |
2021-04-30 | House | Companion considered in lieu of SB 1212 |
2021-04-30 | House | Placed on Local, Consent, and Res. Calendar |
2021-04-27 | House | Considered in Local & Consent Calendars |
2021-04-13 | House | Comm. report sent to Local & Consent Calendar |
2021-04-12 | House | Committee report distributed |
2021-04-12 | House | Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator |
2021-04-06 | House | Reported favorably w/o amendment(s) |
2021-04-06 | House | Recommended to be sent to Local & Consent |
2021-04-06 | House | Considered in formal meeting |
2021-04-01 | House | Left pending in committee |
2021-04-01 | House | Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee |
2021-04-01 | House | Considered in public hearing |
2021-04-01 | House | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . |
2021-03-17 | House | Referred to County Affairs |
2021-03-17 | House | Read first time |
2021-03-03 | House | Filed |
Same As/Similar To
SB1212 (Same As) 2021-05-15 - Effective on 9/1/21