TX HB2780 | 2021-2022 | 87th Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on March 3 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-05-03 - Left pending in committee
Pending: House Environmental Regulation Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on March 3 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-05-03 - Left pending in committee
Pending: House Environmental Regulation Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Relating to the safety of aboveground storage tanks.
Title
Relating to the safety of aboveground storage tanks.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-05-03 | House | Left pending in committee |
2021-05-03 | House | Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee |
2021-05-03 | House | Committee substitute considered in committee |
2021-05-03 | House | Considered in public hearing |
2021-05-03 | House | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . |
2021-04-29 | House | Posting rule suspended |
2021-03-17 | House | Referred to Environmental Regulation |
2021-03-17 | House | Read first time |
2021-03-03 | House | Filed |
Same As/Similar To
SB900 (Same As) 2021-06-08 - Effective on 9/1/21
Subjects
Disaster Preparedness & Relief
Environment
Environment--Water
ENVIRONMENTAL QUALITY, TEXAS COMMISSION ON
Safety
STORAGE TANKS
WATER
Water--General
Environment
Environment--Water
ENVIRONMENTAL QUALITY, TEXAS COMMISSION ON
Safety
STORAGE TANKS
WATER
Water--General