TX HB2888 | 2009-2010 | 81st Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Vetoed on June 19 2009 - 100% progression
Action: 2009-06-19 - Vetoed by the Governor
Status: Vetoed on June 19 2009 - 100% progression
Action: 2009-06-19 - Vetoed by the Governor
Summary
Relating to financial assistance administered by the Texas Department of Housing and Community Affairs.
Title
Relating to financial assistance administered by the Texas Department of Housing and Community Affairs.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2009-06-19 | Vetoed by the Governor | |
2009-06-03 | Sent to the Governor | |
2009-06-03 | Signed in the Senate | |
2009-06-01 | Signed in the House | |
2009-06-01 | Reported enrolled | |
2009-06-01 | House adopts conf. comm. report-reported | |
2009-05-31 | Statement(s) of vote recorded in Journal | |
2009-05-31 | Record vote | |
2009-05-31 | House adopts conference committee report | |
2009-05-31 | Senate adopts conf. comm. report-reported | |
2009-05-31 | Record vote | |
2009-05-31 | Senate adopts conference committee report | |
2009-05-31 | Conf. Comm. Report printed and distributed | |
2009-05-30 | Conference committee report filed | |
2009-05-29 | Senate appoints conferees-reported | |
2009-05-29 | Senate grants request for conf comm-reported | |
2009-05-29 | Senate appoints conferees | |
2009-05-29 | Senate grants request for conference comm. | |
2009-05-29 | House appoints conferees-reported | |
2009-05-29 | House requests conference committee-reported | |
2009-05-29 | House refuses to concur-reported | |
2009-05-29 | House appoints conferees | |
2009-05-29 | House requests conference committee | |
2009-05-29 | House refuses to concur in Senate amendments | |
2009-05-27 | Senate Amendments printed and distributed | |
2009-05-27 | Senate Amendments Analysis distributed | |
2009-05-27 | Senate passage as amended reported | |
2009-05-27 | Record vote | |
2009-05-27 | Passed | |
2009-05-27 | Read 3rd time | |
2009-05-27 | Record vote | |
2009-05-27 | Three day rule suspended | |
2009-05-27 | Vote recorded in Journal | |
2009-05-27 | Read 2nd time & passed to 3rd reading | |
2009-05-27 | Laid before the Senate | |
2009-05-27 | Placed on local & uncontested calendar | |
2009-05-22 | Committee report printed and distributed | |
2009-05-22 | Recommended for local & uncontested calendar | |
2009-05-22 | Reported favorably as substituted | |
2009-05-20 | Testimony taken in committee | |
2009-05-20 | Considered in public hearing | |
2009-05-20 | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . | |
2009-05-08 | Referred to Intergovernmental Relations | |
2009-05-08 | Read first time | |
2009-05-08 | Received from the House | |
2009-05-07 | Reported engrossed | |
2009-05-07 | Nonrecord vote recorded in Journal | |
2009-05-07 | Record vote | |
2009-05-07 | Passed | |
2009-05-07 | Read 3rd time | |
2009-05-07 | Nonrecord vote recorded in Journal | |
2009-05-07 | Passed to engrossment as amended | |
2009-05-07 | Amended | |
2009-05-07 | Read 2nd time | |
2009-05-07 | Placed on Local, Consent, and Res. Calendar | |
2009-05-05 | Rules suspended | |
2009-05-05 | Considered in Local & Consent Calendars | |
2009-05-05 | Returned to Local & Consent Calendars Comm. | |
2009-05-05 | Withdrawn from calendar | |
2009-05-05 | Placed on Local, Consent, and Res. Calendar | |
2009-05-01 | Considered in Local & Consent Calendars | |
2009-04-29 | Comm. report sent to Local & Consent Calendar | |
2009-04-28 | Committee report printed and distributed | |
2009-04-28 | Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator | |
2009-04-21 | Reported favorably as substituted | |
2009-04-21 | Recommended to be sent to Local & Consent | |
2009-04-21 | Committee substitute considered in committee | |
2009-04-21 | Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee | |
2009-04-21 | Considered in public hearing | |
2009-04-21 | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . | |
2009-03-17 | Referred to Urban Affairs | |
2009-03-17 | Read first time | |
2009-03-09 | Filed |