TX HB2915 | 2009-2010 | 81st Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on March 9 2009 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2009-05-13 - Placed on General State Calendar
Status: Introduced on March 9 2009 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2009-05-13 - Placed on General State Calendar
Summary
Relating to oil and gas operations in connection with certain state land.
Title
Relating to oil and gas operations in connection with certain state land.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2009-05-13 | Placed on General State Calendar | |
2009-05-11 | Considered in Calendars | |
2009-05-11 | Committee report sent to Calendars | |
2009-05-08 | Committee report printed and distributed | |
2009-05-08 | Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator | |
2009-05-02 | Reported favorably as substituted | |
2009-05-02 | Committee substitute considered in committee | |
2009-05-02 | Considered in public hearing | |
2009-04-22 | Left pending in committee | |
2009-04-22 | Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee | |
2009-04-22 | Committee substitute considered in committee | |
2009-04-22 | Considered in public hearing | |
2009-04-20 | Posting rule suspended | |
2009-04-01 | Withdrawn from schedule | |
2009-04-01 | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . | |
2009-03-17 | Referred to Energy Resources | |
2009-03-17 | Read first time | |
2009-03-09 | Filed |