TX HB2991 | 2023-2024 | 88th Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 7-0)
Status: Introduced on February 28 2023 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2023-04-26 - Left pending in committee
Pending: House Transportation Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 28 2023 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2023-04-26 - Left pending in committee
Pending: House Transportation Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Relating to toll collection and enforcement by toll project entities; authorizing an administrative fee; imposing a civil penalty.
Title
Relating to toll collection and enforcement by toll project entities; authorizing an administrative fee; imposing a civil penalty.
Sponsors
Rep. Brian Harrison [R] | Rep. Briscoe Cain [R] | Rep. Carrie Isaac [R] | Rep. Terri Leo-Wilson [R] |
Rep. Matt Schaefer [R] | Rep. Nate Schatzline [R] | Rep. Valoree Swanson [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-04-26 | House | Left pending in committee |
2023-04-26 | House | Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee |
2023-04-26 | House | Considered in public hearing |
2023-04-26 | House | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . |
2023-03-14 | House | Referred to Transportation |
2023-03-14 | House | Read first time |
2023-02-28 | House | Filed |
Same As/Similar To
SB316 (Same As) 2023-02-15 - Referred to Transportation
SB316 (Same As) 2023-02-15 - Referred to Transportation
SB316 (Same As) 2023-02-15 - Referred to Transportation