TX HB310 | 2011-2012 | 82nd Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on November 17 2010 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2011-04-12 - Laid on the table subject to call
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on November 17 2010 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2011-04-12 - Laid on the table subject to call
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Summary
Relating to election procedures and qualifications of members of boards of directors for water supply or sewer service corporations.
Title
Relating to election procedures and qualifications of members of boards of directors for water supply or sewer service corporations.
Sponsors
Rep. John Garza [R] | Rep. Tracy King [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-04-12 | Laid on the table subject to call | |
2011-04-12 | Companion considered in lieu of | |
2011-04-05 | Postponed | |
2011-04-05 | Laid out as postponed business | |
2011-03-31 | Postponed | |
2011-03-31 | Laid out as postponed business | |
2011-03-30 | Postponed | |
2011-03-30 | Read 2nd time | |
2011-03-30 | Placed on General State Calendar | |
2011-03-28 | Considered in Calendars | |
2011-03-14 | Committee report sent to Calendars | |
2011-03-11 | Committee report distributed | |
2011-03-11 | Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator | |
2011-03-08 | Reported favorably w/o amendment(s) | |
2011-03-08 | Considered in public hearing | |
2011-03-01 | Left pending in committee | |
2011-03-01 | Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee | |
2011-03-01 | Considered in public hearing | |
2011-03-01 | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . | |
2011-02-15 | Referred to Natural Resources | |
2011-02-15 | Read first time | |
2010-11-17 | Filed |