TX HB3139 | 2011-2012 | 82nd Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on March 10 2011 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2011-05-09 - Comm. report sent to Local & Consent Calendar
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on March 10 2011 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2011-05-09 - Comm. report sent to Local & Consent Calendar
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Relating to fees paid to the consumer credit commissioner and to fees and interest charged in connection with consumer credit transactions.
Title
Relating to fees paid to the consumer credit commissioner and to fees and interest charged in connection with consumer credit transactions.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-05-09 | Comm. report sent to Local & Consent Calendar | |
2011-05-07 | Committee report distributed | |
2011-05-06 | Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator | |
2011-05-06 | Reported favorably w/o amendment(s) | |
2011-05-06 | Recommended to be sent to Local & Consent | |
2011-05-06 | Considered in formal meeting | |
2011-04-12 | Left pending in committee | |
2011-04-12 | Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee | |
2011-04-12 | Considered in public hearing | |
2011-04-12 | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . | |
2011-03-18 | Referred to Pensions, Investments & Financial Services | |
2011-03-18 | Read first time | |
2011-03-10 | Filed |
Subjects
Consumer Protection
Fees & Other Nontax Revenue
Fees & Other Nontax Revenue--State
FINANCE COMMISSION OF TEXAS
Financial
Financial--General
Financial--Savings & Loans
Fees & Other Nontax Revenue
Fees & Other Nontax Revenue--State
FINANCE COMMISSION OF TEXAS
Financial
Financial--General
Financial--Savings & Loans
Texas State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://www.legis.state.tx.us/BillLookup/History.aspx?LegSess=82R&Bill=HB3139 |
Text | http://www.legis.state.tx.us/tlodocs/82R/billtext/html/HB03139I.htm |