TX HB3143 | 2019-2020 | 86th Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 6-3)
Status: Passed on June 14 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-06-14 - Effective on 9/1/19
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 6-3)
Status: Passed on June 14 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-06-14 - Effective on 9/1/19
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
Relating to the Property Redevelopment and Tax Abatement Act.
Title
Relating to the Property Redevelopment and Tax Abatement Act.
Sponsors
Rep. Jim Murphy [R] | Rep. Angie Button [R] | Rep. Scott Sanford [R] | Rep. Candy Noble [R] |
Rep. Matthew Shaheen [R] | Rep. Sheryl Cole [D] | Rep. Ryan Guillen [R] | Sen. Royce West [D] |
Sen. Beverly Powell [D] |
Roll Calls
2019-05-23 - House - House concurs in Senate amendment(s) RV#1753 (Y: 135 N: 7 NV: 1 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2019-05-20 - Senate - Read 3rd time (Y: 0 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2019-05-20 - Senate - Three day rule suspended (Y: 0 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2019-05-20 - Senate - Record vote (Y: 0 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2019-05-20 - Senate - Amendment fails of adoption (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-20 - Senate - Amendment fails of adoption (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-20 - Senate - Amendment fails of adoption (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-20 - Senate - Read 3rd time (Y: 0 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2019-05-20 - Senate - Three day rule suspended (Y: 0 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2019-05-20 - Senate - Record vote (Y: 0 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2019-05-20 - Senate - Amendment fails of adoption (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-20 - Senate - Amendment fails of adoption (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-20 - Senate - Amendment fails of adoption (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-30 - House - Read 3rd time RV#811 (Y: 146 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2019-05-20 - Senate - Read 3rd time (Y: 0 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2019-05-20 - Senate - Three day rule suspended (Y: 0 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2019-05-20 - Senate - Record vote (Y: 0 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2019-05-20 - Senate - Amendment fails of adoption (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-20 - Senate - Amendment fails of adoption (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-20 - Senate - Amendment fails of adoption (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-20 - Senate - Read 3rd time (Y: 0 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2019-05-20 - Senate - Three day rule suspended (Y: 0 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2019-05-20 - Senate - Record vote (Y: 0 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2019-05-20 - Senate - Amendment fails of adoption (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-20 - Senate - Amendment fails of adoption (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-20 - Senate - Amendment fails of adoption (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-30 - House - Read 3rd time RV#811 (Y: 146 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 3) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-06-14 | Effective on 9/1/19 | |
2019-06-14 | Signed by the Governor | |
2019-05-29 | Sent to the Governor | |
2019-05-27 | Senate | Signed in the Senate |
2019-05-26 | House | Signed in the House |
2019-05-25 | House | Reported enrolled |
2019-05-23 | Senate | House concurs in Senate amendment(s)-reported |
2019-05-23 | House | Text of Senate Amendment(s) |
2019-05-23 | House | Record vote RV#1753 |
2019-05-23 | House | House concurs in Senate amendment(s) |
2019-05-21 | House | Senate Amendments Analysis distributed |
2019-05-21 | House | Senate Amendments distributed |
2019-05-20 | House | Senate passage as amended reported |
2019-05-20 | Senate | Record vote |
2019-05-20 | Senate | Passed |
2019-05-20 | Senate | Read 3rd time |
2019-05-20 | Senate | Record vote |
2019-05-20 | Senate | Three day rule suspended |
2019-05-20 | Senate | Record vote |
2019-05-20 | Senate | Passed to 3rd reading as amended |
2019-05-20 | Senate | Record vote |
2019-05-20 | Senate | Amendment fails of adoption |
2019-05-20 | Senate | Amendment(s) offered FA4 Hall |
2019-05-20 | Senate | Record vote |
2019-05-20 | Senate | Amendment fails of adoption |
2019-05-20 | Senate | Amendment(s) offered FA3 Hall |
2019-05-20 | Senate | Record vote |
2019-05-20 | Senate | Amendment fails of adoption |
2019-05-20 | Senate | Amendment(s) offered FA2 Hall |
2019-05-20 | Senate | Vote recorded in Journal |
2019-05-20 | Senate | Amended |
2019-05-20 | Senate | Amendment(s) offered FA1 West |
2019-05-20 | Senate | Read 2nd time |
2019-05-20 | Senate | Vote recorded in Journal |
2019-05-20 | Senate | Rules suspended-Regular order of business |
2019-05-19 | Senate | Placed on intent calendar |
2019-05-17 | Senate | Co-sponsor authorized |
2019-05-16 | Senate | Committee report printed and distributed |
2019-05-16 | Senate | Recommended for local & uncontested calendar |
2019-05-16 | Senate | Reported favorably as substituted |
2019-05-15 | Senate | Considered in public hearing |
2019-05-08 | Senate | Left pending in committee |
2019-05-08 | Senate | Testimony taken in committee |
2019-05-08 | Senate | Considered in public hearing |
2019-05-08 | Senate | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . |
2019-05-01 | Senate | Referred to Natural Resources & Economic Development |
2019-05-01 | Senate | Read first time |
2019-04-30 | Senate | Received from the House |
2019-04-30 | House | Reported engrossed |
2019-04-30 | House | Record vote RV#811 |
2019-04-30 | House | Passed |
2019-04-30 | House | Read 3rd time |
2019-04-29 | House | Passed to engrossment |
2019-04-29 | House | Read 2nd time |
2019-04-25 | House | Placed on General State Calendar |
2019-04-23 | House | Considered in Calendars |
2019-04-12 | House | Committee report sent to Calendars |
2019-04-12 | House | Committee report distributed |
2019-04-11 | House | Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator |
2019-04-03 | House | Reported favorably as substituted |
2019-04-03 | House | Committee substitute considered in committee |
2019-04-03 | House | Considered in public hearing |
2019-03-20 | House | Left pending in committee |
2019-03-20 | House | Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee |
2019-03-20 | House | Committee substitute considered in committee |
2019-03-20 | House | Considered in public hearing |
2019-03-20 | House | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . |
2019-03-13 | House | Referred to Ways & Means |
2019-03-13 | House | Read first time |
2019-03-05 | House | Filed |
Same As/Similar To
SB1838 (Same As) 2019-03-18 - Referred to Natural Resources & Economic Development
Subjects
Economic & Industrial Development
Economic & Industrial Development--General
Electronic Information Systems
PROPERTY REDEVELOPMENT & TAX ABATEMENT ACT
REINVESTMENT ZONES
Taxation
Taxation--Property-Appraisals & Appraisal Districts
Taxation--Property-Exemptions
Taxation--Property-Miscellaneous
Taxation--Property-State Administration
Economic & Industrial Development--General
Electronic Information Systems
PROPERTY REDEVELOPMENT & TAX ABATEMENT ACT
REINVESTMENT ZONES
Taxation
Taxation--Property-Appraisals & Appraisal Districts
Taxation--Property-Exemptions
Taxation--Property-Miscellaneous
Taxation--Property-State Administration