TX HB3155 | 2019-2020 | 86th Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on March 5 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-05-01 - Committee report sent to Calendars
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on March 5 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-05-01 - Committee report sent to Calendars
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Summary
Relating to the applicability of certain laws to open-enrollment charter schools.
Title
Relating to the applicability of certain laws to open-enrollment charter schools.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-05-01 | House | Committee report sent to Calendars |
2019-05-01 | House | Committee report distributed |
2019-04-30 | House | Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator |
2019-04-17 | House | Reported favorably as amended |
2019-04-17 | House | Amendment(s) considered in committee |
2019-04-17 | House | Considered in formal meeting |
2019-04-09 | House | Left pending in committee |
2019-04-09 | House | Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee |
2019-04-09 | House | Considered in public hearing |
2019-04-09 | House | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . |
2019-03-13 | House | Referred to Public Education |
2019-03-13 | House | Read first time |
2019-03-05 | House | Filed |
Same As/Similar To
SB968 (Same As) 2019-05-16 - Failed to receive affirmative vote in comm.
Subjects
City Government
City Government--Land Use & Zoning
County Government
County Government--Land Use & Zoning
Education
Education--Primary & Secondary
Education--Primary & Secondary--Charter Schools
Political Subdivisions
City Government--Land Use & Zoning
County Government
County Government--Land Use & Zoning
Education
Education--Primary & Secondary
Education--Primary & Secondary--Charter Schools
Political Subdivisions