TX HB3165 | 2009-2010 | 81st Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on March 10 2009 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2009-05-14 - Laid on the table subject to call
Status: Introduced on March 10 2009 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2009-05-14 - Laid on the table subject to call
Summary
Relating to prohibition of certain practices by owners of developments supported with low income housing tax credit allocations.
Title
Relating to prohibition of certain practices by owners of developments supported with low income housing tax credit allocations.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2009-05-14 | Laid on the table subject to call | |
2009-05-14 | Companion considered in lieu of | |
2009-05-08 | Placed on General State Calendar | |
2009-05-06 | Considered in Calendars | |
2009-04-30 | Committee report sent to Calendars | |
2009-04-30 | Committee report printed and distributed | |
2009-04-30 | Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator | |
2009-04-29 | Reported favorably w/o amendment(s) | |
2009-04-29 | Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee | |
2009-04-29 | Considered in public hearing | |
2009-04-29 | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . | |
2009-04-23 | No action taken in committee | |
2009-04-23 | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . | |
2009-03-18 | Referred to Urban Affairs | |
2009-03-18 | Read first time | |
2009-03-10 | Filed |
Same As/Similar To
SB1717 (Same As) 2009-06-19 - Effective on 9/1/09
Subjects
Housing
HOUSING & COMMUNITY AFFAIRS, TEXAS DEPARTMENT OF
Housing--Finance
Housing--General
Property Interests
Property Interests--Landlord & Tenant
HOUSING & COMMUNITY AFFAIRS, TEXAS DEPARTMENT OF
Housing--Finance
Housing--General
Property Interests
Property Interests--Landlord & Tenant