TX HB322 | 2023-2024 | 88th Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on May 11 2023 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2023-05-12 - Received from the House
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on May 11 2023 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2023-05-12 - Received from the House
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Summary
Relating to certain burdens of proof in determining a defendant's insanity in a criminal case.
Title
Relating to certain burdens of proof in determining a defendant's insanity in a criminal case.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2023-05-11 - House - Amended RV#1502 (Y: 116 N: 30 NV: 1 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2023-05-10 - House - Amended RV#1461 (Y: 75 N: 63 NV: 1 Abs: 10) [PASS]
2023-05-10 - House - Amended RV#1461 (Y: 75 N: 63 NV: 1 Abs: 10) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-05-12 | Senate | Received from the House |
2023-05-11 | House | Reported engrossed |
2023-05-11 | House | Statement(s) of vote recorded in Journal |
2023-05-11 | House | Record vote RV#1502 |
2023-05-11 | House | Passed as amended |
2023-05-11 | House | Amended 1-Gámez |
2023-05-11 | House | Read 3rd time |
2023-05-10 | House | Statement(s) of vote recorded in Journal |
2023-05-10 | House | Record vote RV#1461 |
2023-05-10 | House | Passed to engrossment as amended |
2023-05-10 | House | Amended 1-Cortez |
2023-05-10 | House | Read 2nd time |
2023-05-09 | House | Placed on General State Calendar |
2023-05-06 | House | Considered in Calendars |
2023-04-28 | House | Committee report sent to Calendars |
2023-04-27 | House | Committee report distributed |
2023-04-27 | House | Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator |
2023-04-21 | House | Reported favorably w/o amendment(s) |
2023-04-21 | House | Considered in formal meeting |
2023-04-21 | House | Recalled from subcommittee |
2023-04-18 | House | Left pending in subcommittee |
2023-04-18 | House | Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in subcommittee |
2023-04-18 | House | Considered by s/c in public hearing |
2023-04-18 | House | Scheduled for public hearing in s/c on . . . |
2023-02-28 | House | Referred directly to subcommittee by chair |
2023-02-23 | House | Referred to Criminal Jurisprudence |
2023-02-23 | House | Read first time |
2022-11-14 | House | Filed |