TX HB324 | 2019-2020 | 86th Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on May 13 2019 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-05-13 - Referred to Criminal Justice
Pending: Senate Criminal Justice Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on May 13 2019 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-05-13 - Referred to Criminal Justice
Pending: Senate Criminal Justice Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Relating to the prosecution of the criminal offense of improper relationship between educator and student.
Title
Relating to the prosecution of the criminal offense of improper relationship between educator and student.
Sponsors
Rep. Andrew Murr [R] |
Roll Calls
2019-05-10 - House - Read 3rd time RV#1336 (Y: 129 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 20) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-05-13 | Senate | Referred to Criminal Justice |
2019-05-13 | Senate | Read first time |
2019-05-13 | Senate | Received from the House |
2019-05-13 | House | Reported engrossed |
2019-05-10 | House | Statement(s) of vote recorded in Journal |
2019-05-10 | House | Record vote RV#1336 |
2019-05-10 | House | Passed |
2019-05-10 | House | Read 3rd time |
2019-05-09 | House | Passed to engrossment |
2019-05-09 | House | Read 2nd time |
2019-05-09 | House | Placed on General State Calendar |
2019-05-07 | House | Considered in Calendars |
2019-04-26 | House | Committee report sent to Calendars |
2019-04-25 | House | Committee report distributed |
2019-04-25 | House | Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator |
2019-04-16 | House | Reported favorably w/o amendment(s) |
2019-04-16 | House | Considered in formal meeting |
2019-04-08 | House | Left pending in committee |
2019-04-08 | House | Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee |
2019-04-08 | House | Considered in public hearing |
2019-04-08 | House | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . |
2019-02-19 | House | Referred to Criminal Jurisprudence |
2019-02-19 | House | Read first time |
2018-11-13 | House | Filed |
Subjects
Crimes
Crimes--Against Persons
Crimes--Against Persons--Sexual
Education
Education--Primary & Secondary
Education--Primary & Secondary--Teachers
Minors
Minors--Crimes Against
Crimes--Against Persons
Crimes--Against Persons--Sexual
Education
Education--Primary & Secondary
Education--Primary & Secondary--Teachers
Minors
Minors--Crimes Against