TX HB3244 | 2009-2010 | 81st Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-1)
Status: Introduced on March 10 2009 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2009-05-11 - Placed on General State Calendar
Status: Introduced on March 10 2009 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2009-05-11 - Placed on General State Calendar
Summary
Relating to the establishment of a centralized sex offender registration authority in certain counties in this state.
Title
Relating to the establishment of a centralized sex offender registration authority in certain counties in this state.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2009-05-11 | Placed on General State Calendar | |
2009-05-08 | Considered in Calendars | |
2009-04-23 | Committee report sent to Calendars | |
2009-04-23 | Committee report printed and distributed | |
2009-04-22 | Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator | |
2009-04-17 | Reported favorably w/o amendment(s) | |
2009-04-17 | Considered in formal meeting | |
2009-04-17 | Scheduled for formal meeting on . . . | |
2009-04-15 | Left pending in committee | |
2009-04-15 | Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee | |
2009-04-15 | Considered in public hearing | |
2009-04-15 | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . | |
2009-04-07 | Referred to Criminal Jurisprudence | |
2009-04-07 | Correction in referral | |
2009-03-18 | Referred to Public Safety | |
2009-03-18 | Read first time | |
2009-03-10 | Filed |
Same As/Similar To
SB2048 (Same As) 2009-06-19 - Effective immediately
Subjects
County Government
County Government--General
Crimes
Crimes--Against Persons
Crimes--Against Persons--Sexual
Criminal Procedure
Criminal Procedure--General
SEXUAL OFFENDERS
County Government--General
Crimes
Crimes--Against Persons
Crimes--Against Persons--Sexual
Criminal Procedure
Criminal Procedure--General
SEXUAL OFFENDERS