TX HB3251 | 2011-2012 | 82nd Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on March 10 2011 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2011-05-02 - Committee report sent to Calendars
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on March 10 2011 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2011-05-02 - Committee report sent to Calendars
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Relating to the provision for notice and comment for pollution control projects.
Title
Relating to the provision for notice and comment for pollution control projects.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-05-02 | Committee report sent to Calendars | |
2011-05-02 | Committee report distributed | |
2011-05-02 | Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator | |
2011-04-29 | Reported favorably w/o amendment(s) | |
2011-04-29 | Considered in formal meeting | |
2011-04-29 | Recommitted to committee | |
2011-05-02 | Placed on General State Calendar | |
2011-04-28 | Considered in Calendars | |
2011-04-20 | Committee report sent to Calendars | |
2011-04-19 | Committee report distributed | |
2011-04-19 | Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator | |
2011-04-18 | Reported favorably w/o amendment(s) | |
2011-04-18 | Considered in formal meeting | |
2011-04-06 | Left pending in committee | |
2011-04-06 | Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee | |
2011-04-06 | Considered in public hearing | |
2011-04-06 | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . | |
2011-03-18 | Referred to Environmental Regulation | |
2011-03-18 | Read first time | |
2011-03-10 | Filed |
Subjects
Environment
Environment--Air
ENVIRONMENTAL QUALITY, TEXAS COMMISSION ON
PERMITS
PUBLIC NOTICE
Utilities
Utilities--Electric
Environment--Air
ENVIRONMENTAL QUALITY, TEXAS COMMISSION ON
PERMITS
PUBLIC NOTICE
Utilities
Utilities--Electric
Texas State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://www.legis.state.tx.us/BillLookup/History.aspx?LegSess=82R&Bill=HB3251 |
Text | http://www.legis.state.tx.us/tlodocs/82R/billtext/html/HB03251I.htm |