TX HB3251 | 2021-2022 | 87th Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on March 8 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-05-13 - Point of order sustained Rule 4, Section 32(c)(2)
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on March 8 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-05-13 - Point of order sustained Rule 4, Section 32(c)(2)
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Relating to the use of unmanned aircraft.
Title
Relating to the use of unmanned aircraft.
Sponsors
Rep. Ed Thompson [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-05-13 | House | Point of order sustained Rule 4, Section 32(c)(2) |
2021-05-13 | House | Read 2nd time |
2021-05-11 | House | Placed on General State Calendar |
2021-05-08 | House | Considered in Calendars |
2021-04-30 | House | Committee report sent to Calendars |
2021-04-30 | House | Committee report distributed |
2021-04-29 | House | Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator |
2021-04-23 | House | Reported favorably w/o amendment(s) |
2021-04-23 | House | Considered in formal meeting |
2021-04-15 | House | Left pending in committee |
2021-04-15 | House | Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee |
2021-04-15 | House | Considered in public hearing |
2021-04-15 | House | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . |
2021-04-12 | House | Posting rule suspended |
2021-03-19 | House | Referred to Homeland Security & Public Safety |
2021-03-19 | House | Read first time |
2021-03-08 | House | Filed |