TX HB3259 | 2023-2024 | 88th Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on April 14 2023 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2023-04-17 - Received from the House
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on April 14 2023 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2023-04-17 - Received from the House
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Summary
Relating to the use of audiovisual technology during meetings by the Texas Water Development Board and the Water Conservation Advisory Council.
Title
Relating to the use of audiovisual technology during meetings by the Texas Water Development Board and the Water Conservation Advisory Council.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2023-04-14 - House - Read 3rd time RV#199 (Y: 143 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 5) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-04-17 | Senate | Received from the House |
2023-04-14 | House | Reported engrossed |
2023-04-14 | House | Nonrecord vote recorded in Journal |
2023-04-14 | House | Record vote RV#199 |
2023-04-14 | House | Passed |
2023-04-14 | House | Read 3rd time |
2023-04-14 | House | Nonrecord vote recorded in Journal |
2023-04-14 | House | Passed to engrossment |
2023-04-14 | House | Read 2nd time |
2023-04-14 | House | Placed on Local, Consent, and Res. Calendar |
2023-04-11 | House | Considered in Local & Consent Calendars |
2023-04-03 | House | Comm. report sent to Local & Consent Calendar |
2023-03-29 | House | Committee report distributed |
2023-03-29 | House | Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator |
2023-03-23 | House | Reported favorably w/o amendment(s) |
2023-03-23 | House | Recommended to be sent to Local & Consent |
2023-03-23 | House | Considered in formal meeting |
2023-03-21 | House | Left pending in committee |
2023-03-21 | House | Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee |
2023-03-21 | House | Considered in public hearing |
2023-03-21 | House | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . |
2023-03-15 | House | Referred to Natural Resources |
2023-03-15 | House | Read first time |
2023-03-02 | House | Filed |
Same As/Similar To
SB679 (Same As) 2023-02-17 - Referred to Business & Commerce
SB679 (Same As) 2023-02-17 - Referred to Business & Commerce
SB679 (Same As) 2023-02-17 - Referred to Business & Commerce
Subjects
Open Meetings
State Agencies, Boards & Commissions
TELECONFERENCING
VIDEOCONFERENCING
WATER
WATER CONSERVATION ADVISORY COUNCIL
WATER DEVELOPMENT BOARD, TEXAS
Water--Development
Water--General
State Agencies, Boards & Commissions
TELECONFERENCING
VIDEOCONFERENCING
WATER
WATER CONSERVATION ADVISORY COUNCIL
WATER DEVELOPMENT BOARD, TEXAS
Water--Development
Water--General