TX HB3270 | 2011-2012 | 82nd Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on June 17 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-06-17 - Effective on 9/1/11
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on June 17 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-06-17 - Effective on 9/1/11
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
Relating to the list of candidates compiled by a state or county party chair for a primary election.
Title
Relating to the list of candidates compiled by a state or county party chair for a primary election.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-06-17 | Effective on 9/1/11 | |
2011-06-17 | Signed by the Governor | |
2011-05-27 | Sent to the Governor | |
2011-05-26 | Signed in the Senate | |
2011-05-26 | Signed in the House | |
2011-05-25 | Reported enrolled | |
2011-05-24 | Senate passage reported | |
2011-05-24 | Record vote | |
2011-05-24 | Passed | |
2011-05-24 | Read 3rd time | |
2011-05-24 | Record vote | |
2011-05-24 | Three day rule suspended | |
2011-05-24 | Vote recorded in Journal | |
2011-05-24 | Read 2nd time & passed to 3rd reading | |
2011-05-24 | Laid before the Senate | |
2011-05-24 | Placed on local & uncontested calendar | |
2011-05-13 | Committee report printed and distributed | |
2011-05-13 | Recommended for local & uncontested calendar | |
2011-05-13 | Reported favorably w/o amendments | |
2011-05-12 | Considered in public hearing | |
2011-05-12 | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . | |
2011-05-05 | Referred to State Affairs | |
2011-05-05 | Read first time | |
2011-05-04 | Received from the House | |
2011-05-04 | Reported engrossed | |
2011-05-03 | Statement(s) of vote recorded in Journal | |
2011-05-03 | Record vote | |
2011-05-03 | Passed | |
2011-05-03 | Read 3rd time | |
2011-05-03 | Passed to engrossment | |
2011-05-03 | Read 2nd time | |
2011-05-03 | Placed on Local, Consent, and Res. Calendar | |
2011-04-29 | Considered in Local & Consent Calendars | |
2011-04-27 | Comm. report sent to Local & Consent Calendar | |
2011-04-27 | Committee report distributed | |
2011-04-26 | Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator | |
2011-04-21 | Reported favorably w/o amendment(s) | |
2011-04-21 | Recommended to be sent to Local & Consent | |
2011-04-21 | Considered in formal meeting | |
2011-04-11 | Left pending in committee | |
2011-04-11 | Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee | |
2011-04-11 | Considered in public hearing | |
2011-04-11 | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . | |
2011-03-18 | Referred to Elections | |
2011-03-18 | Read first time | |
2011-03-11 | Filed |