TX HB3273 | 2023-2024 | 88th Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on June 18 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-06-18 - Effective on 1/1/24
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on June 18 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-06-18 - Effective on 1/1/24
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
Relating to public notice of the availability on the Internet of property-tax-related information.
Title
Relating to public notice of the availability on the Internet of property-tax-related information.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2023-05-17 - House - House concurs in Senate amendment(s) RV#1801 (Y: 142 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2023-05-12 - Senate - Read 3rd time (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-05-12 - Senate - Three day rule suspended (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-04-20 - House - Read 3rd time RV#345 (Y: 146 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2023-05-12 - Senate - Read 3rd time (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-05-12 - Senate - Three day rule suspended (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-04-20 - House - Read 3rd time RV#345 (Y: 146 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-06-18 | Effective on 1/1/24 | |
2023-06-18 | Signed by the Governor | |
2023-05-22 | Sent to the Governor | |
2023-05-21 | Senate | Signed in the Senate |
2023-05-19 | House | Signed in the House |
2023-05-18 | House | Reported enrolled |
2023-05-17 | Senate | House concurs in Senate amendment(s)-reported |
2023-05-17 | House | Text of Senate Amendment(s) |
2023-05-17 | House | Statement(s) of vote recorded in Journal |
2023-05-17 | House | Record vote RV#1801 |
2023-05-17 | House | House concurs in Senate amendment(s) |
2023-05-15 | House | Senate Amendments Analysis distributed |
2023-05-15 | House | Senate Amendments distributed |
2023-05-12 | House | Senate passage as amended reported |
2023-05-12 | Senate | Record vote |
2023-05-12 | Senate | Passed |
2023-05-12 | Senate | Read 3rd time |
2023-05-12 | Senate | Record vote |
2023-05-12 | Senate | Three day rule suspended |
2023-05-12 | Senate | Vote recorded in Journal |
2023-05-12 | Senate | Passed to 3rd reading as amended |
2023-05-12 | Senate | Vote recorded in Journal |
2023-05-12 | Senate | Amended |
2023-05-12 | Senate | Amendment(s) offered FA1 Bettencourt |
2023-05-12 | Senate | Read 2nd time |
2023-05-12 | Senate | Rules suspended-Regular order of business |
2023-05-11 | Senate | Placed on intent calendar |
2023-05-02 | Senate | Committee report printed and distributed |
2023-05-02 | Senate | Recommended for local & uncontested calendar |
2023-05-02 | Senate | Reported favorably w/o amendments |
2023-05-01 | Senate | Vote taken in committee |
2023-05-01 | Senate | Considered in public hearing |
2023-05-01 | Senate | Left pending in committee |
2023-05-01 | Senate | Testimony taken in committee |
2023-05-01 | Senate | Considered in public hearing |
2023-05-01 | Senate | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . |
2023-04-24 | Senate | Referred to Local Government |
2023-04-24 | Senate | Read first time |
2023-04-24 | Senate | Received from the House |
2023-04-20 | House | Reported engrossed |
2023-04-20 | House | Nonrecord vote recorded in Journal |
2023-04-20 | House | Record vote RV#345 |
2023-04-20 | House | Passed |
2023-04-20 | House | Read 3rd time |
2023-04-20 | House | Nonrecord vote recorded in Journal |
2023-04-20 | House | Passed to engrossment |
2023-04-20 | House | Read 2nd time |
2023-04-20 | House | Placed on Local, Consent, and Res. Calendar |
2023-04-17 | House | Considered in Local & Consent Calendars |
2023-04-13 | House | Comm. report sent to Local & Consent Calendar |
2023-04-12 | House | Committee report distributed |
2023-04-12 | House | Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator |
2023-04-04 | House | Reported favorably as substituted |
2023-04-04 | House | Recommended to be sent to Local & Consent |
2023-04-04 | House | Committee substitute considered in committee |
2023-04-04 | House | Considered in formal meeting |
2023-03-27 | House | Left pending in committee |
2023-03-27 | House | Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee |
2023-03-27 | House | Committee substitute considered in committee |
2023-03-27 | House | Considered in public hearing |
2023-03-27 | House | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . |
2023-03-15 | House | Referred to Ways & Means |
2023-03-15 | House | Read first time |
2023-03-02 | House | Filed |
Subjects
COMPTROLLER OF PUBLIC ACCOUNTS
Electronic Information Systems
PUBLIC NOTICE
Taxation
Taxation--Property-Appeal of Tax Decisions
Taxation--Property-Appraisals & Appraisal Districts
Taxation--Property-Assessment & Collection
Taxation--Property-Miscellaneous
Taxation--Property-State Administration
Taxation--Property-Tax Rate
Electronic Information Systems
PUBLIC NOTICE
Taxation
Taxation--Property-Appeal of Tax Decisions
Taxation--Property-Appraisals & Appraisal Districts
Taxation--Property-Assessment & Collection
Taxation--Property-Miscellaneous
Taxation--Property-State Administration
Taxation--Property-Tax Rate