TX HB3308 | 2015-2016 | 84th Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on April 22 2015 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2015-05-20 - Referred to Business & Commerce
Pending: Senate Business & Commerce Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on April 22 2015 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2015-05-20 - Referred to Business & Commerce
Pending: Senate Business & Commerce Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Summary
Relating to the regulation of state trust companies.
Title
Relating to the regulation of state trust companies.
Sponsors
Rep. Dan Flynn [R] |
Roll Calls
2015-04-22 - House - HB 3308Third Reading House (Y: 142 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 5) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-05-20 | Senate | Referred to Business & Commerce |
2015-05-20 | Senate | Read first time |
2015-04-23 | Senate | Received from the House |
2015-04-22 | House | Reported engrossed |
2015-04-22 | House | Record vote |
2015-04-22 | House | Passed |
2015-04-22 | House | Read 3rd time |
2015-04-21 | House | Passed to engrossment |
2015-04-21 | House | Read 2nd time |
2015-04-21 | House | Placed on General State Calendar |
2015-04-16 | House | Considered in Calendars |
2015-04-15 | House | Committee report sent to Calendars |
2015-04-15 | House | Committee report distributed |
2015-04-14 | House | Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator |
2015-04-08 | House | Reported favorably as substituted |
2015-04-08 | House | Committee substitute considered in committee |
2015-04-08 | House | Considered in public hearing |
2015-04-01 | House | Left pending in committee |
2015-04-01 | House | Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee |
2015-04-01 | House | Committee substitute considered in committee |
2015-04-01 | House | Considered in public hearing |
2015-04-01 | House | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . |
2015-03-17 | House | Referred to Investments & Financial Services |
2015-03-17 | House | Read first time |
2015-03-12 | House | Filed |
Subjects
FINANCE COMMISSION OF TEXAS
Financial
Financial--Banks
Financial--General
Property Interests
Property Interests--Trusts
TRUSTS
Financial
Financial--Banks
Financial--General
Property Interests
Property Interests--Trusts
TRUSTS