TX HB3388 | 2011-2012 | 82nd Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on March 11 2011 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2011-05-09 - Comm. report sent to Local & Consent Calendar
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on March 11 2011 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2011-05-09 - Comm. report sent to Local & Consent Calendar
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Summary
Relating to the transport of fireworks.
Title
Relating to the transport of fireworks.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-05-09 | Comm. report sent to Local & Consent Calendar | |
2011-05-06 | Committee report distributed | |
2011-05-06 | Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator | |
2011-05-04 | Reported favorably as substituted | |
2011-05-04 | Recommended to be sent to Local & Consent | |
2011-05-04 | Committee substitute considered in committee | |
2011-05-04 | Considered in formal meeting | |
2011-04-13 | Left pending in committee | |
2011-04-13 | Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee | |
2011-04-13 | Committee substitute considered in committee | |
2011-04-13 | Considered in public hearing | |
2011-04-13 | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . | |
2011-03-18 | Referred to Urban Affairs | |
2011-03-18 | Read first time | |
2011-03-11 | Filed |