TX HB3390 | 2023-2024 | 88th Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 2-1)
Status: Passed on June 2 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-06-02 - Effective immediately
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 2-1)
Status: Passed on June 2 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-06-02 - Effective immediately
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
Relating to the provision of information regarding distributed generation and certain electrical loads.
Title
Relating to the provision of information regarding distributed generation and certain electrical loads.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2023-05-15 - Senate - Read 3rd time (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-05-15 - Senate - Three day rule suspended (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-05-01 - House - Read 3rd time RV#754 (Y: 142 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2023-05-15 - Senate - Three day rule suspended (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-05-01 - House - Read 3rd time RV#754 (Y: 142 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 6) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-06-02 | Effective immediately | |
2023-06-02 | Signed by the Governor | |
2023-05-18 | Sent to the Governor | |
2023-05-17 | Senate | Signed in the Senate |
2023-05-17 | House | Signed in the House |
2023-05-16 | House | Reported enrolled |
2023-05-15 | House | Senate passage reported |
2023-05-15 | Senate | Record vote |
2023-05-15 | Senate | Passed |
2023-05-15 | Senate | Read 3rd time |
2023-05-15 | Senate | Record vote |
2023-05-15 | Senate | Three day rule suspended |
2023-05-15 | Senate | Vote recorded in Journal |
2023-05-15 | Senate | Read 2nd time & passed to 3rd reading |
2023-05-15 | Senate | Rules suspended-Regular order of business |
2023-05-15 | Senate | Placed on intent calendar |
2023-05-10 | Senate | Committee report printed and distributed |
2023-05-10 | Senate | Recommended for local & uncontested calendar |
2023-05-10 | Senate | Reported favorably w/o amendments |
2023-05-10 | Senate | Co-sponsor authorized |
2023-05-09 | Senate | Vote taken in committee |
2023-05-09 | Senate | Considered in public hearing |
2023-05-04 | Senate | Referred to Business & Commerce |
2023-05-04 | Senate | Read first time |
2023-05-02 | Senate | Received from the House |
2023-05-01 | House | Reported engrossed |
2023-05-01 | House | Statement(s) of vote recorded in Journal |
2023-05-01 | House | Record vote RV#754 |
2023-05-01 | House | Passed |
2023-05-01 | House | Read 3rd time |
2023-04-28 | House | Passed to engrossment |
2023-04-28 | House | Read 2nd time |
2023-04-28 | House | Placed on General State Calendar |
2023-04-26 | House | Considered in Calendars |
2023-04-26 | House | Committee report sent to Calendars |
2023-04-25 | House | Committee report distributed |
2023-04-25 | House | Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator |
2023-04-20 | House | Reported favorably as substituted |
2023-04-20 | House | Committee substitute considered in committee |
2023-04-20 | House | Considered in formal meeting |
2023-04-05 | House | Left pending in committee |
2023-04-05 | House | Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee |
2023-04-05 | House | Considered in public hearing |
2023-04-05 | House | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . |
2023-03-15 | House | Referred to State Affairs |
2023-03-15 | House | Read first time |
2023-03-03 | House | Filed |
Same As/Similar To
SB1295 (Same As) 2023-03-28 - Left pending in committee
SB1295 (Same As) 2023-03-28 - Left pending in committee
SB1295 (Same As) 2023-03-28 - Left pending in committee
Subjects
City Government
City Government--Utilities
ELECTRIC RELIABILITY COUNCIL OF TEXAS
PUBLIC UTILITY COMMISSION
Utilities
Utilities--Electric
Utilities--General
City Government--Utilities
ELECTRIC RELIABILITY COUNCIL OF TEXAS
PUBLIC UTILITY COMMISSION
Utilities
Utilities--Electric
Utilities--General