TX HB3406 | 2009-2010 | 81st Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on March 11 2009 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2009-04-24 - Corrected committee report sent to Calendars
Status: Introduced on March 11 2009 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2009-04-24 - Corrected committee report sent to Calendars
Summary
Relating to certificates of convenience and necessity.
Title
Relating to certificates of convenience and necessity.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2009-04-24 | Corrected committee report sent to Calendars | |
2009-04-24 | Corrected comm. report printed & distributed | |
2009-04-24 | Corrected com rept filed w/ Comte Coordinator | |
2009-04-21 | Committee report sent to Calendars | |
2009-04-20 | Committee report printed and distributed | |
2009-04-20 | Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator | |
2009-04-17 | Reported favorably as substituted | |
2009-04-17 | Committee substitute considered in committee | |
2009-04-17 | Considered in formal meeting | |
2009-04-17 | Scheduled for formal meeting on . . . | |
2009-03-31 | Left pending in committee | |
2009-03-31 | Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee | |
2009-03-31 | Committee substitute considered in committee | |
2009-03-31 | Considered in public hearing | |
2009-03-31 | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . | |
2009-03-19 | Referred to State Affairs | |
2009-03-19 | Read first time | |
2009-03-11 | Filed |
Same As/Similar To
SB1913 (Same As) 2009-05-26 - Placed on Major State Calendar