TX HB3406 | 2011-2012 | 82nd Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on March 11 2011 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2011-05-04 - Committee report sent to Calendars
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on March 11 2011 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2011-05-04 - Committee report sent to Calendars
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Summary
Relating to the authority of a psychologist to delegate certain acts to a person under the psychologist's supervision.
Title
Relating to the authority of a psychologist to delegate certain acts to a person under the psychologist's supervision.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-05-04 | Committee report sent to Calendars | |
2011-05-03 | Committee report distributed | |
2011-05-03 | Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator | |
2011-04-28 | Reported favorably as substituted | |
2011-04-28 | Committee substitute considered in committee | |
2011-04-28 | Considered in public hearing | |
2011-04-20 | Left pending in committee | |
2011-04-20 | Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee | |
2011-04-20 | Committee substitute considered in committee | |
2011-04-20 | Considered in public hearing | |
2011-04-20 | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . | |
2011-03-18 | Referred to Public Health | |
2011-03-18 | Read first time | |
2011-03-11 | Filed |
Subjects
Mental Health & Mental Retardation
Occupational Regulation
Occupational Regulation--Health Occupations
PSYCHOLOGISTS
PSYCHOLOGISTS, TEXAS STATE BOARD OF EXAMINERS OF
Occupational Regulation
Occupational Regulation--Health Occupations
PSYCHOLOGISTS
PSYCHOLOGISTS, TEXAS STATE BOARD OF EXAMINERS OF