TX HB3428 | 2017-2018 | 85th Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on March 8 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2017-05-08 - Placed on General State Calendar
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on March 8 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2017-05-08 - Placed on General State Calendar
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Summary
Relating to minimum standards regarding the continuity of prescription medications for the care and treatment of county jail prisoners.
Title
Relating to minimum standards regarding the continuity of prescription medications for the care and treatment of county jail prisoners.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-05-08 | House | Placed on General State Calendar |
2017-05-06 | House | Considered in Calendars |
2017-05-04 | House | Committee report sent to Calendars |
2017-05-03 | House | Committee report distributed |
2017-05-03 | House | Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator |
2017-04-27 | House | Reported favorably as substituted |
2017-04-27 | House | Committee substitute considered in committee |
2017-04-27 | House | Considered in public hearing |
2017-04-20 | House | Left pending in committee |
2017-04-20 | House | Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee |
2017-04-20 | House | Considered in public hearing |
2017-04-19 | House | Posting rule suspended |
2017-03-31 | House | Referred to County Affairs |
2017-03-31 | House | Read first time |
2017-03-08 | House | Filed |