TX HB3438 | 2009-2010 | 81st Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on June 19 2009 - 100% progression
Action: 2009-06-19 - Effective immediately
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on June 19 2009 - 100% progression
Action: 2009-06-19 - Effective immediately
Summary
Relating to authorizing the Texas Board of Criminal Justice to convey certain real property to the City of Dallas in exchange for comparable property.
Title
Relating to authorizing the Texas Board of Criminal Justice to convey certain real property to the City of Dallas in exchange for comparable property.
Sponsors
Rep. Terri Hodge [D] | Sen. Royce West [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2009-06-19 | Effective immediately | |
2009-06-19 | Signed by the Governor | |
2009-06-01 | Sent to the Governor | |
2009-05-31 | Signed in the Senate | |
2009-05-30 | Signed in the House | |
2009-05-30 | Reported enrolled | |
2009-05-28 | Senate passage reported | |
2009-05-26 | Record vote | |
2009-05-26 | Passed | |
2009-05-26 | Read 3rd time | |
2009-05-26 | Record vote | |
2009-05-26 | Three day rule suspended | |
2009-05-26 | Vote recorded in Journal | |
2009-05-26 | Read 2nd time & passed to 3rd reading | |
2009-05-26 | Rules suspended-Regular order of business | |
2009-05-26 | Placed on intent calendar | |
2009-05-20 | Committee report printed and distributed | |
2009-05-20 | Recommended for local & uncontested calendar | |
2009-05-20 | Reported favorably w/o amendments | |
2009-05-19 | Considered in public hearing | |
2009-05-19 | Posting rule suspended | |
2009-05-01 | Referred to Criminal Justice | |
2009-05-01 | Read first time | |
2009-04-23 | Received from the House | |
2009-04-22 | Reported engrossed | |
2009-04-22 | Record vote | |
2009-04-22 | Passed | |
2009-04-22 | Read 3rd time | |
2009-04-22 | Passed to engrossment | |
2009-04-22 | Read 2nd time | |
2009-04-22 | Placed on Local, Consent, and Res. Calendar | |
2009-04-20 | Considered in Local & Consent Calendars | |
2009-04-15 | Comm. report sent to Local & Consent Calendar | |
2009-04-14 | Committee report printed and distributed | |
2009-04-14 | Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator | |
2009-04-08 | Reported favorably w/o amendment(s) | |
2009-04-08 | Recommended to be sent to Local & Consent | |
2009-04-08 | Considered in public hearing | |
2009-04-01 | Left pending in committee | |
2009-04-01 | Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee | |
2009-04-01 | Considered in public hearing | |
2009-04-01 | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . | |
2009-03-19 | Referred to Land & Resource Management | |
2009-03-19 | Read first time | |
2009-03-11 | Filed |
Subjects
Corrections
Corrections--Jails & Prisons
CRIMINAL JUSTICE, TEXAS BOARD OF
DALLAS, CITY OF
Property Interests
Property Interests--Real Property
Public Lands, Buildings & Resources
Corrections--Jails & Prisons
CRIMINAL JUSTICE, TEXAS BOARD OF
DALLAS, CITY OF
Property Interests
Property Interests--Real Property
Public Lands, Buildings & Resources