TX HB3456 | 2021-2022 | 87th Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-1)
Status: Passed on June 14 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-06-14 - Effective immediately
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-1)
Status: Passed on June 14 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-06-14 - Effective immediately
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
Relating to inclusion of funds received by certain educational institutions or programs in foundation school program funds for purposes of certain budget reductions.
Title
Relating to inclusion of funds received by certain educational institutions or programs in foundation school program funds for purposes of certain budget reductions.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2021-05-25 - Senate - Read 3rd time (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-05-25 - Senate - Three day rule suspended (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-05-11 - House - Read 3rd time RV#951 (Y: 143 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2021-05-25 - Senate - Three day rule suspended (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-05-11 - House - Read 3rd time RV#951 (Y: 143 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 5) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-06-14 | Effective immediately | |
2021-06-14 | Signed by the Governor | |
2021-05-29 | Sent to the Governor | |
2021-05-29 | Senate | Signed in the Senate |
2021-05-28 | House | Signed in the House |
2021-05-27 | House | Reported enrolled |
2021-05-27 | House | Senate passage reported |
2021-05-25 | Senate | Record vote |
2021-05-25 | Senate | Passed |
2021-05-25 | Senate | Read 3rd time |
2021-05-25 | Senate | Record vote |
2021-05-25 | Senate | Three day rule suspended |
2021-05-25 | Senate | Vote recorded in Journal |
2021-05-25 | Senate | Read 2nd time & passed to 3rd reading |
2021-05-25 | Senate | Rules suspended-Regular order of business |
2021-05-25 | Senate | Placed on intent calendar |
2021-05-25 | Senate | Co-sponsor authorized |
2021-05-24 | Senate | Committee report printed and distributed |
2021-05-24 | Senate | Reported favorably w/o amendments |
2021-05-24 | Senate | Considered in public hearing |
2021-05-24 | Senate | Co-sponsor authorized |
2021-05-21 | Senate | Left pending in committee |
2021-05-21 | Senate | Considered in public hearing |
2021-05-21 | Senate | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . |
2021-05-14 | Senate | Referred to Education |
2021-05-14 | Senate | Read first time |
2021-05-12 | Senate | Received from the House |
2021-05-11 | House | Reported engrossed |
2021-05-11 | House | Nonrecord vote recorded in Journal |
2021-05-11 | House | Statement(s) of vote recorded in Journal |
2021-05-11 | House | Record vote RV#951 |
2021-05-11 | House | Passed |
2021-05-11 | House | Read 3rd time |
2021-05-11 | House | Nonrecord vote recorded in Journal |
2021-05-11 | House | Passed to engrossment |
2021-05-11 | House | Read 2nd time |
2021-05-11 | House | Placed on Local, Consent, and Res. Calendar |
2021-05-07 | House | Considered in Local & Consent Calendars |
2021-05-05 | House | Comm. report sent to Local & Consent Calendar |
2021-05-05 | House | Committee report distributed |
2021-05-04 | House | Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator |
2021-04-23 | House | Reported favorably as substituted |
2021-04-23 | House | Recommended to be sent to Local & Consent |
2021-04-23 | House | Committee substitute considered in committee |
2021-04-23 | House | Considered in formal meeting |
2021-04-20 | House | Left pending in committee |
2021-04-20 | House | Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee |
2021-04-20 | House | Committee substitute considered in committee |
2021-04-20 | House | Considered in public hearing |
2021-04-20 | House | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . |
2021-03-22 | House | Referred to Public Education |
2021-03-22 | House | Read first time |
2021-03-10 | House | Filed |
Subjects
ADULT EDUCATION
BLIND & VISUALLY IMPAIRED, TEXAS SCHOOL FOR THE
CRIMINAL JUSTICE, TEXAS DEPARTMENT OF
DEAF, TEXAS SCHOOL FOR THE
Education
Education--Primary & Secondary
Education--Primary & Secondary--Charter Schools
Education--Primary & Secondary--Discipline
Education--Primary & Secondary--Finance
FOUNDATION SCHOOL PROGRAM
Governor
JUVENILE JUSTICE DEPARTMENT, TEXAS
LEGISLATIVE BUDGET BOARD
BLIND & VISUALLY IMPAIRED, TEXAS SCHOOL FOR THE
CRIMINAL JUSTICE, TEXAS DEPARTMENT OF
DEAF, TEXAS SCHOOL FOR THE
Education
Education--Primary & Secondary
Education--Primary & Secondary--Charter Schools
Education--Primary & Secondary--Discipline
Education--Primary & Secondary--Finance
FOUNDATION SCHOOL PROGRAM
Governor
JUVENILE JUSTICE DEPARTMENT, TEXAS
LEGISLATIVE BUDGET BOARD