TX HB3542 | 2011-2012 | 82nd Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 22-5)
Status: Engrossed on May 15 2011 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2011-05-16 - Referred to State Affairs
Pending: Senate State Affairs Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on May 15 2011 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2011-05-16 - Referred to State Affairs
Pending: Senate State Affairs Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Summary
Relating to a supplemental payment for retirees of the Teacher Retirement System of Texas and the unfunded actuarial liabilities allowed under that system.
Title
Relating to a supplemental payment for retirees of the Teacher Retirement System of Texas and the unfunded actuarial liabilities allowed under that system.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-05-16 | Referred to State Affairs | |
2011-05-16 | Read first time | |
2011-05-16 | Received from the House | |
2011-05-15 | Reported engrossed | |
2011-05-13 | Statement(s) of vote recorded in Journal | |
2011-05-13 | Record vote | |
2011-05-13 | Passed | |
2011-05-13 | Read 3rd time | |
2011-05-12 | Passed to engrossment | |
2011-05-12 | Read 2nd time | |
2011-05-09 | Placed on General State Calendar | |
2011-05-05 | Considered in Calendars | |
2011-05-04 | Committee report sent to Calendars | |
2011-05-03 | Committee report distributed | |
2011-05-03 | Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator | |
2011-04-28 | Reported favorably as substituted | |
2011-04-28 | Committee substitute considered in committee | |
2011-04-28 | Considered in formal meeting | |
2011-04-19 | Left pending in committee | |
2011-04-19 | Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee | |
2011-04-19 | Considered in public hearing | |
2011-04-19 | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . | |
2011-03-22 | Referred to Pensions, Investments & Financial Services | |
2011-03-22 | Read first time | |
2011-03-11 | Filed |