TX HB3717 | 2011-2012 | 82nd Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on March 11 2011 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2011-05-09 - Committee report sent to Calendars
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on March 11 2011 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2011-05-09 - Committee report sent to Calendars
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Summary
Relating to a study regarding emergency service in rural areas.
Title
Relating to a study regarding emergency service in rural areas.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-05-09 | Committee report sent to Calendars | |
2011-05-09 | Committee report distributed | |
2011-05-09 | Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator | |
2011-05-02 | Reported favorably as substituted | |
2011-05-02 | Committee substitute considered in committee | |
2011-05-02 | Considered in public hearing | |
2011-04-11 | Left pending in committee | |
2011-04-11 | Committee substitute considered in committee | |
2011-04-11 | Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee | |
2011-04-11 | Considered in public hearing | |
2011-04-11 | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . | |
2011-03-23 | Referred to Border & Intergovernmental Affairs | |
2011-03-23 | Read first time | |
2011-03-11 | Filed |
Subjects
9-1-1 EMERGENCY TELEPHONE NUMBER
COMPTROLLER OF PUBLIC ACCOUNTS
County Government
County Government--Finance
Fees & Other Nontax Revenue
Fees & Other Nontax Revenue--Local
Health
Health--Emergency Services & Personnel
RURAL
STATE EMERGENCY COMMUNICATIONS, COMMISSION ON
Taxation
Taxation--County
Utilities
Utilities--Telecommunications
Utilities--Telecommunications--Rural
COMPTROLLER OF PUBLIC ACCOUNTS
County Government
County Government--Finance
Fees & Other Nontax Revenue
Fees & Other Nontax Revenue--Local
Health
Health--Emergency Services & Personnel
RURAL
STATE EMERGENCY COMMUNICATIONS, COMMISSION ON
Taxation
Taxation--County
Utilities
Utilities--Telecommunications
Utilities--Telecommunications--Rural